Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brimer, Russell, filed a(n) Toxic,Environmental - Torts case represented by Sheffer, Gregory M, against Chronicle Books, Llc, Does 1 To 600, Paul Frank Industries, Inc., represented by Goodhart, Kathleen Howard, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Katherine Feinstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKatherine Feinstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeToxic,Environmental |
Case Cycle Time497 days |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CHRONICLE BOOKS, LLC PAUL FRANK INDUSTRIES, INC.
Date: October 04, 2010NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: July 23, 2010ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 CONSENT TO JUDGMENT.
Date: June 13, 2011THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT
Date: June 13, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2011 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event | MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR DEC-05-2011 VACATED. JUDGMENT ON FILE. (206) | |
November 21, 2011 | Hearing |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GAIL DEKREON |
|
November 18, 2011 | Hearing |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GAIL DEKREON |
|
November 04, 2011 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR NOV-18-2011 - COURTROOM CLOSED. IF A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE DISPOSITIVE OF THE CASE, THE PARTIES MAY REQUEST ONE AT TIME OF TRIAL. | |
August 24, 2011 | Hearing |
MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event | MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-24-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR - JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 13, 2011 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Ofmotion And Motion To Approve Prop 65 Settlement And Enter [Proposed] Judgment Set for hearing on Monday, June 13, 2011, line 5, PLAINTIFF RUSSELL BRIMER'S Motion To Approve Proposition 65 Set...
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 CONSENT TO JUDGMENT. | |
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.