Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Reyes, Javier, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Bassin, Scott Irwin, against Does 1 To X, Great Western Bank, Gregory, Carol, Gregory, Carole, Gregory, Kenneth, (total of 10) See All represented by Bridgman, James Campbell, Sorich, John M., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with A. James Robertson II presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions573 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1755 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint in a legal case. The case number is CGC-09-493106 and the filing date is Oct-27-2009. The plaintiff is Javier Reyes and the defendant is Janice Rodgers, et al. The document provides detail...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 02, 2009ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: July 16, 2014PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE EXAMINER, (MAY 5, 12, 19, 26)) OF SUMMONS
Date: May 26, 2010PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)
Date: July 30, 2012DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO X
Date: April 28, 2011ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS
Date: April 26, 2010CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REYES, JAVIER
Date: October 19, 2012THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT
Date: December 17, 2012CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REYES, JAVIER
Date: November 23, 2011CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REYES, JAVIER
Date: May 04, 2012ORDER APPROVING REPORT OF REFEREE AND SALE OF REAL PROPERTY
Date: August 28, 2012CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REYES, JAVIER
Date: December 18, 2012ORDER APPROVING REPORT OF REFEREE AND SALE OF REAL PROPERTY.
Date: August 28, 2012DECLARATION OF SCOTT I. BASSIN IN SUPPORT OF FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REYES, JAVIER
Date: October 17, 2012DECLARATION OF IN SUPPORT OF FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REYES, JAVIER
Date: October 17, 2012DECLARATION OF JAVIER REYES IN SUPPORT OF FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REYES, JAVIER
Date: October 17, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2014 | Tentative Ruling |
MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND Matter on calendar for Wednesday, July 23, 2014, Line 1: DEFENDANT JANICE RODGERS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DE...
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
|
July 23, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, 302, DEFENDANT JANICE RODGERS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND IS OFF CALENDAR. ORDER HAS BEEN FILED ON JULY 16, 2014. JUDGE: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II; CLERK: GINA GONZALES; REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER, CSR# 5976. (302) | |
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-23-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DENYING MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAUT WAS ENTERED JULY 16, 2014 FILED BY PLAINTIFF REYES, JAVIER | |
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event | REPLY TO PLTF'S BRIEF RE: NOTICE TO DEFAULTED DEFTS OF PROVE UP HEARING FILED BY DEFENDANT RODGERS, JANICE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF ERNESTINE HARRIS | |
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event | BRIEF REGARDING NTC TO DEFAULTED DEFT'S OF PROVE-UP HERAING FILED BY PLAINTIFF REYES, JAVIER | |
July 09, 2014 | Tentative Ruling |
MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND Matter on calendar for Wednesday, July 9, 2014, Line 1, DEFENDANT JANICE RODGERS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEF...
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
July 09, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.