Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cavalry Portfolio Services, Llc, As Assignee Of, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn, Brian N, against Does 1-10, Inclusive, Turner, Lloyd E, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 26, 2009 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions62 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time137 days |
This complaint is a document related to a legal case in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The case number is CGC-09-486663 and the filing date is April 14, 2009. The plaintiff is Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, as assignee o...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF MAZDA AMERICA CREDIT | |
June 24, 2009 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE | |
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF MAZDA AMERICA CREDIT RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT TURNER, LLOYD E AKA LLOYD EUGENE TURNER AKA LLOYD TURNER $6,091.52 PRINCIPAL, $950.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $1,213.46 INTEREST, $255.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $8,509.98, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE | |
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION BRIAN D. WINN FILED RE: INTERESTPL FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF MAZDA AMERICA CREDIT | |
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, COURT JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $255.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT TURNER, LLOYD E AKA LLOYD EUGENE TURNER AKA LLOYD TURNER | |
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION BRIAN N. WINN FILED RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF MAZDA AMERICA CREDIT | |
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION JASON BOTTIGLIERI FILED RE: COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS, DEFICIENCY MEMORANDUM, DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CCP 585) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF MAZDA AMERICA CREDIT | |
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF MAZDA AMERICA CREDIT SERVED APR-07-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT TURNER, LLOYD E AKA LLOYD EUGENE TURNER AKA LLOYD TURNER | |
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event | EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF MAZDA AMERICA CREDIT AS TO DEFENDANT TURNER, LLOYD E AKA LLOYD EUGENE TURNER AKA LLOYD TURNER DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-22-2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.