Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Beneficial California Inc A Delaware Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Paris, Jeffrey A., against Calvoperez, Jose, Does 1 To 10, Both Inclusive, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions102 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time224 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF APR-10-2009 SET ASIDE | |
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event | FEE PAID DECL. OF KAREN M. PARIS RE REQUEST TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION | |
April 17, 2009 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW. JUDGMENT ON FILE. (212) | |
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT CALVOPEREZ, JOSE AKA JOSE L.CALVOPEREZ $4,625.23 PRINCIPAL, $720.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $162.56 INTEREST, $311.60 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,819.39, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10, BOTH INCLUSIVE | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION SERVED FEB-06-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CALVOPEREZ, JOSE AKA JOSE L.CALVOPEREZ | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $311.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT CALVOPEREZ, JOSE AKA JOSE L.CALVOPEREZ | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION KAREN M. PARIS FILED RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION GS SOBAL FILED RE: ACCRUED DEFAULT INTEREST FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION JULIAN MCGHEE FILED RE: CCP 585(D), NON-EXISTENCE OF DOCUMENTS AND NON MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.