Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Levinson, Marsha, Taylor, Leon, filed a(n) Subrogation - Insurance case represented by Kerley, J Edward, Merchasin, Marcus Daniel, against Bardin, Changwin, Bardin, David, Does 1 Thru 60, Incl., Fire Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, A Corporation, (total of 7) See All represented by Danforth, Lee James, Robinson, Ralph Wells, Wheeler, Richard Dewey, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Kennedy Stewart Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2008 |
CategorySubrogation/Insurance |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions806 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeSubrogation |
|
Case Cycle Time981 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal of a case filed by Marsha Levinson and Leon Taylor against Fire Insurance Exchange, a corporation. The case number is CGC-08-482411 and the filing date is August 10, 2011. The document includes information ab...
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BARDIN, DAVID BARDIN, CHANGWIN
Date: February 24, 2010MINUTES FOR JUN-14-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 505
Date: June 14, 2011MINUTES FOR JUN-30-2011 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 505
Date: June 30, 2011MINUTES FOR JUN-29-2011 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 505
Date: June 29, 2011MINUTES FOR JUN-23-2011 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 505
Date: June 23, 2011MINUTES FOR JUN-27-2011 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 505
Date: June 27, 2011ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: March 15, 2011MINUTES FOR JUN-28-2011 8:00 AM FOR DEPT 505
Date: June 28, 2011MINUTES FOR JUN-20-2011 8:45 AM FOR DEPT 505
Date: June 20, 2011MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-12-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR - MEDIATED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
Date: December 28, 2010SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAR-21-2011 CONTINUED TO MAR-25-2011 AT 10:00 AM IN 606
Date: December 22, 2010MINUTES FOR JUN-16-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 505
Date: June 16, 2011MINUTES FOR JUN-21-2011 8:00 AM FOR DEPT 505
Date: June 21, 2011MINUTES FOR JUN-15-2011 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 505
Date: June 15, 2011MINUTES FOR JUN-03-2011 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 613
Date: June 03, 2011EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED
Date: July 06, 2011MINUTES FOR JUN-22-2011 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 505
Date: June 22, 2011MINUTES FOR JUL-06-2011 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 505
Date: July 06, 2011WITNESS LIST FILED
Date: July 06, 2011MINUTES FOR JUL-05-2011 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 505
Date: July 05, 2011MINUTES FOR JUL-01-2011 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 505
Date: July 01, 2011EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: July 06, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Date: January 29, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT LEE, JEFFREY JEFFREY LEE INSURANCE AGENCY
Date: March 16, 2009ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS
Date: September 10, 2009ORDER - STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: November 24, 2009ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
Date: June 14, 2011ORDER APPROVING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT 877.6(A)(2).
Date: December 23, 2010ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AUGMENT EXPERT WITNESS LIST AND EXPERT DECLARATION
Date: June 20, 2011ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA
Date: June 29, 2011DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT
Date: August 10, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2011 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 OSC - TRIAL DEPARTMENT
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT | |
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT JURY FEE FILED BY DEFENDANT FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE FEE DEPOSITED BY CODDINGTON, HICKS & DANFORTH FOR JURY FEE FOR JUL-06-2011 FOR TRIAL IN DEPT 505 | |
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event | PER DIEM FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT JURY FEE FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEVINSON, MARSHA TAYLOR, LEON FEE DEPOSITED BY HEREFORD KERLEY LLP FOR JURY FEE FOR JUN-27-2011 THROUGH JUN-28-2011 FOR TRIAL IN DEPT 505 | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | PER DIEM FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT JURY FEE FILED BY DEFENDANT FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE FEE DEPOSITED BY CODDINGTON, HICKS & DANFORTH FOR JURY FEE FOR JUN-28-2011 THROUGH JUN-30-2011 FOR TRIAL IN DEPT 505 | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | PER DIEM FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF LEVINSON, MARSHA TAYLOR, LEON | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT JURY FEE FILED BY DEFENDANT FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE FEE DEPOSITED BY CODDINGTON, HICKS & DANFORTH FOR JURY FEE FOR JUN-20-2011 THROUGH JUN-27-2011 FOR TRIAL IN DEPT 505 | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT JURY FEE FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEVINSON, MARSHA TAYLOR, LEON FEE DEPOSITED BY HEREFORD KERLEY LLP FOR JURY FEE FOR JUN-29-2011 FOR TRIAL IN DEPT 505 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.