Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of The West, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Holloway, Douglas Alan, against Does One Through Ten Inclusive, Raborn, Vernon, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 13, 2008 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions56 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time140 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint document in a case between Bank of the West and Vernon Raborn et al. The case number is CGC-03-478602 and was filed on Oct-08-2908. The document includes information about the attorney for...
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES ONE THROUGH TEN INCLUSIVE
Date: October 08, 2008NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 13, 2008ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE OF WITNESS AT DEFAULT HEARING.
Date: December 01, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2009 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-16-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR DEC-04-2008 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 218 | |
December 04, 2008 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF BANK OF THE WEST RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT RABORN, VERNON INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA DISPATCH TRUCKING $30,442.94 PRINCIPAL, $2,500.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $1,959.60 INTEREST, $341.24 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $35,243.78, SEE SCANNED DOC | |
December 04, 2008 | Hearing |
Default Prove-Up Hearing.
Judge: WILLIAM R. GARGANO |
|
December 04, 2008 | Docket Event | UNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF DEC-04-2008, DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING. GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY LOIS JONES, CSR #3689. | |
December 01, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE OF WITNESS AT DEFAULT HEARING. | |
November 25, 2008 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER WAIVING APPERANCE OF WITNESS AT DEFAULT HEARING, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION C FILED BY PLAINTIFF BANK OF THE WEST | |
November 25, 2008 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING. HEARING SET FOR DEC-04-2008 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 218 | |
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES ONE THROUGH TEN INCLUSIVE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.