Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
KAMAL KAID VS. INNOVATE FACILITY SERVICES LLC et al
On August 04, 2008 a wrongful discharge case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge James J. McBride presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 04, 2008
Last Refreshed
August 31, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
WRONGFUL DISCHARGE
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
Wrongful Termination
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year and 14 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a document related to a legal case in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The case number is CGC-08-478177 and the filing date is July 16, 2009. The complaint is between Kamal Kaid and Innovative Facility …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT
Date: Jul 16, 2009NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: Feb 17, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT INNOVATE FACILITY SERVICES LLC
Date: Sep 30, 2008NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: Aug 04, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2009 | hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JAMES J. MCBRIDE |
|
August 21, 2009 | hearing |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN |
|
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event | MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-31-2009 VACATED. DISMISSAL FILED ON 7/16/09. (206) | |
August 17, 2009 | hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JAMES J. MCBRIDE |
|
July 31, 2009 | hearing |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN |
|
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-21-2009 - DISMISSAL OF THE COMPLAINT FILED. JUDGE KATHERINE FEINSTEIN, CLERK MELINKA JONES, NOT REPORTED. (220) | |
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT | |
June 17, 2009 | hearing |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
|
June 17, 2009 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR JUN-17-2009 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 301 | |
June 17, 2009 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, 301, DEFENDANT INNOVATE FACILITY SERVICES LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS OFF CALENDAR AT THE REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY. JUDGE: PETER J\. BUSCH, REPORTER: CAROL KAREN, CSR # 8189 (301/PJB) | |
June 04, 2009 | hearing |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 301, NO APPEARANCES ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS: DEFENDANT INNOVATE FACILITY SERVICES L L C'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS CONTINUED TO JUNE 17, 2009 PER AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES. JUDGE: PETER J\. BUSCH, REPORTER: CAROL KAREN CSR # 8189 301/PJB | |
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR JUN-04-2009 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 301 | |
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event | OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT INNOVATE FACILITY SERVICES LLC | |
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event | REPLY DECLARATION OF JONMI N KOO IN SUPPORT OF DEFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT INNOVATE FACILITY SERVICES LLC | |
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event | REPLY MEMO P/A IN SUPPORT DEFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT INNOVATE FACILITY SERVICES LLC | |
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event | POS OF RELY MEMO P/A IN SUPPORT OF DEFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE; REPLY DECLARATION OF JONMI N KOO FILED BY DEFENDANT INNOVATE FACILITY SERVICES LLC | |
May 21, 2009 | hearing |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
|
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ABEL KAID IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KAID, KAMAL | |
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ALI KAID IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KAID, KAMAL | |
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SAM KAID IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KAID, KAMAL | |
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF KAMAL KAID IN OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KAID, KAMAL | |
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KAID, KAMAL | |
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event | SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS FILED IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF KAID, KAMAL | |
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event | TABLE OF AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KAID, KAMAL | |
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF CARY S. KLETTER IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF KAID, KAMAL | |
May 13, 2009 | Docket Event | ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS: MICHAEL, ISSA J. ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR KAID, KAMAL | |
May 06, 2009 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JUL-31-2009 CONTINUED TO AUG-21-2009 AT 1:30 PM IN 220 | |
May 06, 2009 | Docket Event | MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-17-2009 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ON AUG-31-2009 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206 PER 5/6/09 EX PARTE ORDER. (206) | |
May 06, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON STIPULATION | |
May 05, 2009 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON STIPULATION, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF KAID, KAMAL | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BASED ON STIPULATION | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BASED ON STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF KAID, KAMAL | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 301, DEFENDANT INNOVATE FACILITY SERVICES LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS CONTINUED FROM MAY-21-2009 TO LAW AND MOTION JUN-04-2009, 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 301 PURSUANT TO MAY 4, 2009 EX-PARTE ORDER. | |
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE THE HEARIN ON DEFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMRY JUDGMENT; POS, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF KAID, KAMAL | |
March 24, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY ATTORNEY KLETTER, CARY S. | |
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE, AFFIDAVIT, DECLARATION, SEPARATE STATEMENT ; APPENDIX FILED BY DEFENDANT INNOVATE FACILITY SERVICES LLC HEARING SET FOR MAY-21-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 | |
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAVID R ONGARO IN SUPPORT OF DEFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT INNOVATE FACILITY SERVICES LLC | |
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM | |
February 06, 2009 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
January 22, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-31-2009 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 220. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR AUG-17-2009 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON FEB-06-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY ONGARO, DAVID R | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT INNOVATE FACILITY SERVICES LLC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS | |
January 02, 2009 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-02-2009 CONTINUED TO FEB-06-2009 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 30, 2008 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT INNOVATE FACILITY SERVICES LLC | |
August 04, 2008 | Docket Event | WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KAID, KAMAL AS TO DEFENDANT INNOVATE FACILITY SERVICES LLC DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-02-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-03-2008 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-18-2008 | |
August 04, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF |