Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Regalado, Edward, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Millar, James Mark, against Does 1-20, Incl., Golden Gate Disposal & Recycling Inc., Norcal Waste Systems, Inc., represented by Hagopian, Mark Andrew, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 05, 2008 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions374 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time406 days |
This complaint is a document related to a legal case filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The case number is CGC-08-474914, and it was filed on May 14, 2009. The complaint is between Edward Regalado and Norcal Waste Sys...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: May 05, 2008NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGALADO, EDWARD
Date: April 24, 2009DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT
Date: May 14, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2009 | Hearing |
ARBITRATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
June 16, 2009 | Hearing |
ARBITRATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event | ARBITRATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-07-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR/DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT. | |
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT | |
April 24, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGALADO, EDWARD | |
April 21, 2009 | Hearing |
To Compel Responses To Formm Interrogatories And For Monetary Sanctions
Judge: PAUL SLAVIT |
|
April 13, 2009 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY, 610, DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORMM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS. OFF CALENDAR, AT THE REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY. | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORMM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING INC. ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED HEREIN AS NORCAL WASTE MANAGEMENT DBA GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL) HEARING SET FOR APR-21-2009 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610 | |
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event | ARBITRATOR ERIC MARSHALL ABRAMSON APPOINTED. ARBITRATOR'S JURISDICTION MAR-02-2009 THROUGH MAY-31-2009. | |
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event | ARBITRATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUL-07-2009 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.