Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Amundin, Andreas, Blackstone Technology Group, Inc., filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints case represented by , Narbaitz, Dena L., against Amundin, Andreas, Does 1-50, Inclusive, represented by , Louderback, Charles Michael, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 27, 2007 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions297 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time562 days |
This complaint is a cross-complaint filed by Andreas Amundin against Blackstone Technology Group, Inc. The complaint alleges intentional interference with prospective economic advantage, unfair competition, and intentional interference with and disru...
ORDER SHORTENING TIME
Date: August 29, 2008ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT BLACKSTONE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC.
Date: February 25, 2008ORDER -STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY
Date: February 28, 2008DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE
Date: March 05, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT AMUNDIN, ANDREAS
Date: February 07, 2008NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT OF JURY FEES
Date: September 30, 2008MINUTES FOR JAN-22-2009 2:00 PM FOR DEPT 306
Date: January 22, 2009ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: October 01, 2008ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: December 10, 2008NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 27, 2007MINUTES FOR MAR-02-2009 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: March 02, 2009MINUTES FOR JAN-26-2009 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 306
Date: January 26, 2009MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-24-2008 IS OFF CALENDAR - MEDIATED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
Date: September 16, 2008MINUTES FOR FEB-02-2009 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: February 02, 2009MINUTES FOR JAN-28-2009 3:00 PM FOR DEPT 306
Date: January 28, 2009MINUTES FOR JAN-27-2009 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: January 27, 2009ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO VACATE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE
Date: November 26, 2008DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY ANDREAS AMUNDIN ON FEB-7-2008.
Date: March 13, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event | JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION R1608A01J005 FORFEITED | |
June 10, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING JUN-09-2009 AT 10:00AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 09, 2009 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
June 09, 2009 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR JUN-09-2009 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 212 | |
April 21, 2009 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-21-2009 CONTINUED TO JUN-09-2009 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FAILURE TO DISMISS DEC-31-2008 2ND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 17, 2009 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY ANDREAS AMUNDIN ON FEB-7-2008. | |
March 06, 2009 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-17-2009 CONTINUED TO APR-21-2009 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 05, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.