Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Chan, Lily, Lin, Jun Xiang, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Eastridge, Thomas, against Does 1 Through 20 Inclusive, First Supreme Investment, Inc., A California, Ho, Steven Shiu-Fan, Jin Fan He, Lin, Jun Xiang, (total of 8) See All represented by Drexel, Baron Jerome, Lynch, Kelly M., Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 19, 2007 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions591 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1001 days |
This complaint is an amendment to a previous complaint filed by Lily Chan against multiple defendants. The amendment is made to identify a defendant named Patrick Liu, who was previously referred to as DOE 2. The complaint was filed in the Superior C...
MINUTES FOR NOV-23-2009 3:30 PM FOR DEPT 502
Date: November 23, 2009ORDER COMPELLING DEPOSITION OF JIN FAN HE
Date: August 10, 2009ORDER COMPELLING DEPOSITION OF JIN FAN HE
Date: September 28, 2009GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT LIU, PATRICK
Date: September 29, 2009NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT OF JURY FEES
Date: November 16, 2009ORDER COMPELLING DEPOSITION OF STEVEN CHIU FAN HO AND FOR SANCTIONS
Date: February 27, 2009SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JUN-22-2009 CONTINUED TO JUN-22-2009 AT 3:30 PM IN 502
Date: January 30, 2009NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 19, 2007ORDER COMPELLING DEPOSITION FO STEVEN CHIU-FAN HO AND FOR SANCTIONS
Date: November 05, 2008ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HO, STEVEN CHIU-FAN
Date: October 22, 2007ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MEDIATION SET FOR DEC-10-2008 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
Date: September 16, 2008ORDER DENYING DEFEDANT'S (JIN FAN HE) MOTION TO RECUSE PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL
Date: August 04, 2009AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE JIN FAN HE
Date: October 03, 2008NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAN, LILY
Date: November 25, 2009ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JIN FAN HE
Date: February 10, 2009ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE
Date: April 28, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING MAR-16-2010 AT 10:00AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 16, 2010 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
March 16, 2010 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR MAR-16-2010 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 212 | |
February 16, 2010 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
February 05, 2010 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-16-2010 CONTINUED TO MAR-16-2010 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 12, 2010 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-12-2010 CONTINUED TO FEB-16-2010 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 07, 2009 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JAMES J. MCBRIDE |
|
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAN, LILY | |
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR NOV-23-2009 - CASE SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 212 ON JAN-12-2010 AT 10:00 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.