Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Creditors Trade Association,, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bedoyan, Hagop T, Kappos, Stephen M, against Esfandairy, Fereidoon Aka Fred Edfandiary Aka, Esfandiary, Fereidoon, Mr Cafe, A California Corporation, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2007 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions566 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1247 days |
DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: September 02, 2008NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 14, 2007NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED BY DEFENDANT ESFANDIARY, FEREIDOON
Date: January 04, 2008ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.50
Date: June 18, 2007ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ESFANDIARY, FEREIDOON
Date: June 25, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2010 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $20.00 RE 18482 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO AOC OPS ACCOUNT, WARRANT #00656423, DATED JUL-15-2010 | |
November 07, 2008 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
October 14, 2008 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF NOV-07-2008, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED (SWEEP) | |
September 05, 2008 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
September 02, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-05-2008 CONTINUED TO NOV-07-2008 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 02, 2008 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-02-2008 CONTINUED TO SEP-05-2008 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER COURT CALENDAR ON JAN-14-2008. ASSIGNED TO PRETRIAL DEPT. 212 ON MAY-02-2008 AT 10:30 AM FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR STATUS OF STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 14, 2008 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: DAVID BALLATI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.