Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
2555 Pulgas Epa A California Limited Liability, 29Th And Mission A California Liability Company, 2555 Pulgas Epa, Llc, Cullinane, Jeremiah J, Gary Chan Plumbing, (total of 9) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by De La Pena, Gregory Ramon, Lee, Christine, Eshoo, George Paul, against 2555 Pulgas Epa, Llc, 29Th And Mission A California Liability Company, Alcott, Paul, All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or, All Persons Unknown,Claming Any Legal Or Equitable, (total of 47) See All represented by Caldwell, Michael T, Keenan, James J., Cominos, Dion Nicholas, De La Pena, Gregory Ramon, Eshoo, George Paul, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Curtis E.A. Karnow presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions731 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time2376 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case. The case number is CGC-06-459175 and it involves a personal injury, property damage, or wrongful death claim. The plaintiff/petitioner is Nabeel Youssef, doing business as Good Frikin Chicken...
ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SANTOS & URRUTIA ASSOCIATES, INC
Date: September 08, 2010MINUTES FOR MAR-16-2011 2:30 PM FOR DEPT 304
Date: March 16, 2011MINUTES FOR MAR-04-2011 11:30 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: March 04, 2011ORDER - PROTECTIVE ORDER LIMITING SCOPE AND ATTENDANCE AT DEPOSITIONS
Date: December 23, 2010MINUTES FOR FEB-07-2011 2:30 PM FOR DEPT 304
Date: February 07, 2011MINUTES FOR OCT-13-2010 3:00 PM FOR DEPT 304
Date: October 13, 2010MINUTES FOR AUG-19-2010 11:00 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: August 19, 2010MINUTES FOR SEP-09-2010 9:15 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: September 09, 2010REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO DEFENDANT COOPERSMITH, LISA
Date: September 13, 2012NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA'S C&R ROOFING
Date: September 17, 2012REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO DEFENDANT HEUSER, GLENN
Date: September 13, 2012ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT J & K SHEET METAL
Date: August 10, 2010MINUTES FOR OCT-07-2011 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: October 07, 2011MINUTES FOR JUL-27-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: July 27, 2011MINUTES FOR JAN-26-2012 12:00 PM FOR DEPT 304
Date: January 26, 2012MINUTES FOR OCT-31-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: October 31, 2011ORDER EXTENDING FIVE YEAR STATUTE (CCP 583.340) AND DEADLINE TO COMPLETE DISCOVERY
Date: March 05, 2012NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY ATTORNEY SHANAGHER, DENIS FRANCIS
Date: March 07, 2012MINUTES FOR JUN-02-2010 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: June 02, 2010MINUTES FOR APR-07-2010 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: April 07, 2010ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT J & K SHEET METAL
Date: October 01, 2009MINUTES FOR OCT-23-2009 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: October 23, 2009MINUTES FOR AUG-11-2009 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 304
Date: August 11, 2009ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT J & K SHEET METAL
Date: June 12, 2009MINUTES FOR JUN-16-2009 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 304
Date: June 16, 2009PAYER NOTIFIED OF PARTIAL PAYMENT OF FEE
Date: April 14, 2009ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT KEVIN J. BARRY IRON WORKS
Date: April 13, 2009MINUTES FOR APR-10-2009 11:00 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: April 10, 2009ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 10
Date: March 20, 2009ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SANTOS & URRUTIA, INC
Date: March 30, 2009ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 9
Date: January 20, 2009ORDER COMPELLING JOINDER OF OMITTED PARTY
Date: November 25, 2008ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 8
Date: December 10, 2008ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 7
Date: November 07, 2008ORDER NUMBER 6 ON CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: October 14, 2008ORDER TO VACATE SANCTIONS IMPOSED ON GEROGE P. ESHOO ON APR-17-2007
Date: April 27, 2007SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT J & K SHEET METAL COMPANY
Date: March 30, 2011MINUTES FOR DEC-08-2010 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: December 08, 2010MINUTES FOR OCT-25-2010 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 304
Date: October 25, 2010MINUTES FOR MAR-21-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: March 21, 2011ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT KEVIN J. BARRY IRON WORKS
Date: July 29, 2010ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 16
Date: April 27, 2011ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL
Date: October 07, 2011ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL
Date: January 24, 2012ORDER RE VISVESHWARA/SCHULTZ'S DEMURRER AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: May 19, 2009ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 11
Date: May 20, 2009SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT KEVIN J. BARRY IRON WORKS
Date: March 28, 201213 MOTIONS IN LIMINE FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT KEVIN J. BARRY IRON WORKS
Date: March 21, 2012ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT GARDNER, DRAKE ZONE DESIGN
Date: August 13, 2009ORDER EXTENDING FIVE YEAR STATUTE
Date: September 26, 2012ORDER GENERAL ORDER RE: CASE RE-ASSIGNMENT
Date: January 22, 2013ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA'S C&R ROOFING
Date: November 03, 2010ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GARY CHAN PLUMBING
Date: December 07, 2010ORDER MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: March 21, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2013 | Hearing |
Bifurcated Court Trial
Judge: CURTIS KARNOW |
|
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event | COMPLEX LITIGATION CALENDAR ON JUL-01-2013 IN DEPT. 304, COMPLEX LITIGATION OFF CALENDAR. | |
June 17, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN FEES AND COSTS; THIS DISMISSAL IS JUBJECT TO THE COURT'S RETAINED JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT UNDER CCP 664.6 (TRANSACTION ID # 52872585) AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO TIFFANY GARDENS A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY 29TH AND MISSION A CALIFORNIA LIABILITY COMPANY TIFFANY GARDENS, L.P. (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #465139) MALONEY, BRIAN (DEFENDANT AND CROSS DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #459371) LONG, EILEEN (DEFENDANT AND CROSS DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #459371) CULLINANIE, JERRY (DEFENDANT AND CROSS DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #459371) SULLIVAN, JOHN L (DEFENDANT AND CROSS DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #459371) 2555 PULGAS EPA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #459371) SAN FRANCISCO TIFFANY GARDENS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A NON PROFIT CALIFORNIA CORPORATION | |
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION FOLLOWING DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 AND ORDER THEREON (TRANSACTION #52450515) | |
April 15, 2013 | Hearing |
Bifurcated Court Trial
Judge: CURTIS KARNOW |
|
April 10, 2013 | Docket Event | COMPLEX LITIGATION CALENDAR SET FOR APR-15-2013 CONTINUED TO JUL-01-2013 AT 9:00 AM IN 304 AT REQUEST OF PARTIES. | |
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event | FEE PAID ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION FOLLOWING DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6 AND ORDER THEREON (TRANSACTION ID # 51531731) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO TIFFANY GARDENS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION | |
February 11, 2013 | Hearing |
Bifurcated Court Trial
Judge: CURTIS KARNOW |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event | COMPLEX LITIGATION CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-11-2013 CONTINUED TO APR-15-2013 AT 9:00 AM IN 304 AT REQUEST OF PARTIES FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OR TO CONFIRM DISMISSAL OF ALL PARTIES. JUDGE CURTIS E.A. KARNOW, CLERK DANIAL LEMIRE. | |
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT THIS DISMISSAL IS SUBJECT TO THE COURT'S RETAINED JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT UNDER CCP SECT 664.6 (TRANSACTION ID # 49075056) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.