Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bateman, Lisa, Bateman, Trent, Hughes, Jack, Hughes, Karen, Mountain Thunder Coffee Plantation Int'L Inc., (total of 8) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brunetti, Kenneth A, against Bateman, Lisa, Bateman, Trent, Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Hughes, Jack, Hughes, Karen, (total of 9) See All represented by Carlson, Richard Henry, Kidani, Grant K, Wasserman, David, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2005 |
CategoryContract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions476 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time496 days |
ORDER COMPELLING AND DENYING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS.
Date: October 04, 2005MINUTES FOR FEB-09-2006 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 606
Date: February 09, 2006MINUTES FOR FEB-07-2006 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 606
Date: February 07, 2006MINUTES FOR FEB-08-2006 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 606
Date: February 08, 2006MINUTES FOR FEB-06-2006 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 606
Date: February 06, 2006NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 20, 2005ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO ALLOW FILING AND SERVICE OF COMPULSORY CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: October 07, 2005NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: August 05, 2005ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 01, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W2006110J012 (JURY FEES), PAYABLE TO MILLER & VAN EATON, TAG 27748, OTSP06500622, WARRANT #03163951, DATED MAY-31-2006 | |
May 16, 2006 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 12, 2006 | Docket Event | CRC 225 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-16-2006 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 11, 2006 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 10, 2006 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SWEET LEAF LLC, A HAWAII LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY HUGHES, JACK AN INDIVIDUAL HUGHES, KAREN AN INDIVIDUAL | |
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event | MINUTES FOR FEB-09-2006 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 606 | |
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM JURY TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-09-2006 - CASE SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 212 ON MAY-16-2006 AT 10:00 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 225. JUDGE JOHN CONWAY, CLERK KAY PEEK, REPORTER JANET POND | |
February 09, 2006 | Hearing |
JURY TRIAL
Judge: JOHN J. CONWAY |
|
February 08, 2006 | Docket Event | MINUTES FOR FEB-08-2006 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 606 | |
February 08, 2006 | Hearing |
JURY TRIAL
Judge: JOHN J. CONWAY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.