Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kirk, Douglas, Thomas Dee Engineering Company, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Donadio, David R, Pro Per, against American Standard, Inc., Asbestos Defendants, Babcock Borsig Power Inc Ref To As Db Riley Inc, Bridgestone Firestone Americas Holdings, Inc., Bridgestone Firestone North American Life, Llc;, (total of 38) See All represented by Biderman, David T., Blomquist, Sonja Elizabeth, Brown, Eugene, Cataldo, Lori A., Choe, Jiyon, (total of 33) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2002 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Date: October 08, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
Date: October 28, 2002ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION
Date: October 18, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CONGOLEUM CORPORATION
Date: October 17, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION
Date: October 24, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE U.S.A., INC.
Date: November 15, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GATKE CORPORATION
Date: October 17, 2003ORDER GRANTING FLUOR CORP.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION
Date: November 01, 2007ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE [C.C.P. 583.310]
Date: May 31, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2014 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-01-2014 - ***CASE IS DISMISSED.*** NO APPEARANCE FOR SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT DOUGLAS KIRK. LAUREN PEEBLES APPEARING FOR DESGINATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. AFTER REVIEWING THE PAPERS THAT PLAINTIFF WAS SERVED BY BERRY AND BERRY OF TODAY'S HEARING AND THERE WAS NO APPEARANCE OR RESPONSE FILED, THE COURT ORDERED THE CASE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ (503) | |
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 54979624) FILED BY DEFENDANT DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL - BERRY & BERRY | |
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADDING CASE TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR (TRANSACTION ID # 54979624) FILED BY DEFENDANT DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL - BERRY & BERRY | |
February 06, 2014 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-06-2014 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-01-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR NO APPEARANCE BY SELF-REPRESENTED PLAINTIFF, DOUGLAS KIRK. BERRY & BERRY TO FILE A NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADDING CASE TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR WHICH WAS FILED ON 12/5/13 AND TO GIVE NOTICE OF THE 5/1/14 OSC DATE. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: EBURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503) | |
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADDING CASE TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR | |
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SET FOR FEB-06-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 503 | |
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADDING CASE TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR (TRANSACTION ID # 54633794) FILED BY DEFENDANT DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL - BERRY & BERRY | |
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSELS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADDING CASE TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION OF EVANTHIA M. SPANOS, ESQ. IN SUPPORT; [PROPOSED] ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 54633794) FILED BY DEFENDANT DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL - BERRY & BERRY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.