Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Black, Leslie Kilby 2269 Chestnut Street, Apt., S. Handa & Sons, Inc., T. Okamoto & Co, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Miller, John C, Moore, Thomas Allen, Pro Per, Schwartz, Douglas Robert, against Does 1 To 500 Inclusive, Sakai, Chieko, Sakai, Tamotsu, S. Handa & Sons, Inc., S. Handa Sons, Inc., (total of 6) See All represented by Caulfield, Barbara An E, Douglass, Michael C, Meredith, Nicole L., Chapman, Laura L., Lossing, Lawrence Gordon, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 14, 2002 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT T. OKAMOTO & CO
Date: June 28, 2002DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT S. HANDA & SONS, INC.
Date: November 08, 2002ORDER GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (BTW PLTF & DEFT S. HANDA SONS, INC.)
Date: January 11, 2005ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SAKAI, TAMOTSU SAKAI, CHIEKO
Date: July 19, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SAKAI, TAMOTSU SAKAI, CHIEKO
Date: July 19, 2002AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 201 TO BE S. HANDA SONS, INC.
Date: August 19, 2002ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL
Date: January 21, 2004ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT S. HANDA SONS, INC.
Date: March 06, 2003ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SAKAI, TAMOTSU SAKAI, CHIEKO
Date: April 01, 2003ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT T. OKAMOTO & CO
Date: May 14, 2003ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT S. HANDA & SONS, INC.
Date: June 25, 2003ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT T. OKAMOTO & CO
Date: August 05, 2003ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SAKAI, TAMOTSU SAKAI, CHIEKO
Date: November 06, 2003DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT T. OKAMOTO & CO
Date: March 23, 2004ORDER DENYING PLTF'S MOTION TO QUASH AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: May 14, 2004ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL
Date: June 08, 2004DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY S. HANDA & SONS, INC.
Date: January 20, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event | JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W1904219J020 FORFEITED | |
April 07, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING APR-05-2005 AT 10:00AM PURSUANT TO CRC 225. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 05, 2005 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 05, 2005 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR APR-05-2005 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 212 | |
March 03, 2005 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W1805111J007 (JURY FEES), PAYABLE TO SCHWARTZ & CERA, LLP, TAG 26071, OTSP05000700, WARRANT #02870745, DATED MAR-03-2005 | |
February 18, 2005 | Tentative Ruling |
MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT OFF CALENDAR PER FEB. 4, 2005 DISMISSAL.(302/JUDGE BUSCH)
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
February 18, 2005 | Hearing |
MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
February 18, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT SAKAI, TAMOTSU SAKAI, CHIEKO | |
February 18, 2005 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR FEB-18-2005 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
February 18, 2005 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302,DEFENDANT CHIEKO SAKAI MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT. OFF CALENDAR PER FEB. 4, 2005 DISMISSAL.(302/JUDGE BUSCH)CAROL A. KAREN #8189 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.