Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Imperial Irrigation District, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Brough Emily, Freedman Scott A., Freedman Scott Ariel, Tan Zhen He, Tan Zhen He He, (total of 8) See All against Ashley Marion, County Of Riverside, Imperial Irrigation District, Jeffries Kevin, Perez V. Manuel, (total of 10) See All represented by Brand Alexander M., Brand Alexander Michael, Green Matthew Lawrence, Hanna Robert J., Brough Emily, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mary H. Strobel presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management335 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Proof of Service -
Date: September 20, 2018NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -
Date: September 20, 2018PETITIONER'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE
Date: September 20, 2018STIPULATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE
Date: September 20, 2018NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: September 20, 2018NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER
Date: September 20, 2018NOTICE OF REJECTION ? PLEADINGS
Date: September 20, 2018RECEIPT FOR RECORD
Date: September 20, 2018REGISTER OF ACTIONS
Date: September 20, 2018NOTICE OF TRANSFER
Date: September 20, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 20, 2018REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER'S MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE
Date: September 20, 2018REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER'S MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE
Date: September 20, 2018RESPONDENTS' MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE
Date: September 20, 2018NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES INCLUDING TRIAL
Date: September 20, 2018NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: September 20, 2018REQUEST FOR PREPARATION OF RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY ORDINANCE NO. 943
Date: September 20, 2018NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT
Date: September 20, 2018PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE ETC.
Date: September 20, 2018CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL
Date: September 20, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: September 20, 2018DECLARATION OF KEVIN E. KELLY IN SUPPORT OF PFTITIONER'S MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE
Date: September 20, 2018DECLARATION OF SCOTT A. FREEDMAN IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER'S MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE
Date: September 20, 2018MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER'S MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE
Date: September 20, 2018PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE
Date: September 20, 2018NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON
Date: September 24, 2018NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: October 01, 2018NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: October 01, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -
Date: October 04, 2018Legacy Document -
Date: October 04, 2018Legacy Document -
Date: October 09, 2018Notice of Continuance
Date: October 10, 2018Declaration - Declaration of Green in opposition to motion for preliminary injunction
Date: October 15, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (MOTION OF PETITIONER, IMPERIAL IRRIGATION DISTRICT, FOR PRELI...)
Date: November 06, 2018Notice - Re-notice of trial setting conference
Date: October 18, 2018Reply - Reply IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: October 29, 2018Order - ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: November 06, 2018Notice - Re-notice of trial setting conference
Date: November 07, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: November 27, 2018Notice - Notice of Trial Setting Conference
Date: November 27, 2018Notice of Related Case
Date: December 05, 2018Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: December 14, 2018Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS APPEAL FILED
Date: December 14, 2018Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: December 18, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 08, 2019Notice - Notice Respondents Trial Setting Conference Statement
Date: January 09, 2019Notice of Lodging - Notice of Lodging of Record of Proceedings
Date: January 29, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 25, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 25, 2019Declaration - Declaration In Support of Motion for Stay
Date: February 25, 2019Memorandum - Memorandum In Support of Motion for Stay
Date: February 25, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 25, 2019Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: February 25, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: February 25, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 08, 2019Memorandum - OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND
Date: March 08, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF GREEN IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND
Date: March 08, 2019Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY
Date: March 14, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPL. DECLARATION OF MATTHEW L. GREEN
Date: March 14, 2019Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: March 22, 2019Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: March 25, 2019Separate Statement
Date: April 18, 2019Motion to Quash
Date: April 18, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF MATT GREEN
Date: April 18, 2019Motion for Protective Order
Date: April 25, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF MATTHEW L. GREEN
Date: April 25, 2019Memorandum - MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: April 25, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: April 26, 2019Notice - NOTICE MOTION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: April 26, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 26, 2019Notice - NOTICE DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF ACTION
Date: April 26, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: June 10, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (TELEPHONIC))
Date: June 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: July 02, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO STRIKE OFF CALENDAR
Date: July 03, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING THE DEMURRER OFF CALENDAR
Date: July 03, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 12, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: August 13, 2019Memorandum - MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM OF COSTS ON APPEAL
Date: August 16, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 21, 2019Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: September 03, 2019Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT -2ND
Date: September 04, 2019Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: September 04, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: October 30, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: October 30, 2019Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: October 30, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 30, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATTE
Date: October 30, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 15, 2019Ex Parte Application - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE TO CONTINUE HEARINGS
Date: November 18, 2019Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: November 15, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 10, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER, IMPERIAL IRRIGATION DISTR...)
Date: November 19, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: February 10, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: February 10, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSEPH TARTAKOVSKY
Date: February 10, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 13, 2020Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF IMPERIAL IRRIGATION DISTRICT’S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: February 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RIVERSIDE COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, KEVIN JEFFRIES, JOHN F...)
Date: February 25, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: March 06, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 18, 2020Answer
Date: March 23, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2020
Date: March 18, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH
Date: April 03, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: April 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 14, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020
Date: April 14, 2020Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: April 17, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: August 06, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: August 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF RESPONDENTS, COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE, RIVERSIDE COUNTY ...)
Date: September 15, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF EMILY L. BROUGH IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STATEMENT ON DISCOVERY
Date: September 04, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 04, 2020Brief - BRIEF JOINT STATEMENT ON DISCOVERY
Date: September 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE)
Date: September 11, 2020Brief - BRIEF JOINT STATEMENT
Date: October 01, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 06, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF RULING RE: PETITIONER'S EX PARTE HEARING
Date: October 15, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 12, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 13, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 23, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND SANCTIONS
Date: November 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: November 24, 2020Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND SANCTIONS
Date: December 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 07, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/07/2020
Date: December 07, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 25, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: February 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 25, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: March 02, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 04, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 18, 2021Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: March 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 29, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: March 29, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/29/2021
Date: March 29, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 02, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: May 20, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 05, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: June 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: June 04, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CERTAIN COUNSEL
Date: July 23, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 19, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: September 21, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: December 29, 2021CIVIL REGISTER REPORT
Date: September 20, 2018Request for Judicial Notice -
Date: October 04, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -
Date: October 09, 2018Minute Order - (Ex-Parte Application of Petitioner, Imperial Irrigation Distr...)
Date: October 09, 2018Request for Judicial Notice -
Date: October 09, 2018Declaration - of Matthew Green in opposition to ex parte
Date: October 09, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities - in opposition to ex parte
Date: October 09, 2018Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
Date: October 09, 2018Request for Judicial Notice - in opposition to ex parte application
Date: October 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 40 Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
May 23, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Jury Trial |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 40 Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Not Held - Vacated by Court Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 40 Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
March 24, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Status Conference |
|
January 05, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion for Protective Order scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
January 05, 2022 | Hearing | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request for Dismissal With prejudice, Complaint, Entire Action: Name Extension: With prejudice, Complaint, Entire Action; As To Parties changed from Marion Ashley (Respondent), John F. Tavaglione (Respondent), Kevin Jeffries (Respondent), Riverside County Board Of Supervisors (Respondent), Chuck Washington (Respondent), V. Manuel Perez (Respondent), Karen Spiegel (Defendant), Jeff Hewitt (Defendant), County of Riverside (Respondent) to Marion Ashley (Respondent), V. Manuel Perez (Respondent), John F. Tavaglione (Respondent), Karen Spiegel (Defendant), Chuck Washington (Respondent), Kevin Jeffries (Respondent), County of Riverside (Respondent), Riverside County Board Of Supervisors (Respondent), Jeff Hewitt (Defendant) | |
January 05, 2022 | Hearing | Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | On the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by Imperial Irrigation District on , entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Imperial Irrigation District as to the entire action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.