Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Doe John, filed a(n) Writ - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Hathaway Mark Mcclellan, against Claremont Mckenna College, represented by Cronin Rachel Schy, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mary H. Strobel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary H. Strobel Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2018 |
CategoryWrit - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time586 days |
PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS
Date: June 29, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: June 29, 2018NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON
Date: July 02, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: July 16, 2018NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: July 17, 2018AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS
Date: August 23, 2018Minute Order - (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: October 11, 2018Brief - BRIEF PETITIONER'S OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS
Date: August 16, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 16, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 16, 2019Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDATE
Date: September 30, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING THE PORTIONS OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD UNDER SEAL
Date: September 30, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 01, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF THE JOINT APPENDIX
Date: October 15, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE OSC RE DISMISSAL
Date: December 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: December 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT)
Date: January 14, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: February 05, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT)
Date: February 06, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT) | ||
February 06, 2020 | Hearing |
Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 82 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court |
|
February 05, 2020 | Request for Dismissal | ||
February 05, 2020 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal Filed by John Doe (Petitioner) |
|
January 14, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT) | ||
January 14, 2020 | Hearing |
Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT)) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 82 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 82 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation |
|
December 09, 2019 | Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE OSC RE DISMISSAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.