Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lyons Valroide, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case against Metromile, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard E. Rico presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard E. Rico Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2018 |
CategoryPetition To Compel/Confirm/Vacate Arbitration (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time488 days |
SUMMONS -
Date: May 30, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)
Date: November 15, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)
Date: October 22, 2018Declaration - Declaration of Edward E. Dollar re Failure to Appear at Court Hearing
Date: December 07, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for failure to appear, may ...)
Date: December 18, 2018Petition - Petition Petition for Order Compelling Arbiration
Date: January 11, 2019Notice - Notice of Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration
Date: January 11, 2019Notice - Notice OF STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: March 01, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 20, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION
Date: March 20, 2019Petition - PETITION PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION
Date: March 20, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)
Date: May 01, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 02, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: May 06, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 28, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: August 06, 2019Order - ORDER ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING
Date: August 29, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: August 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)
Date: September 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2019 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL) | ||
September 30, 2019 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held Judge: Richard E. Rico |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal) | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | On the Petition filed by VALROIDE LYONS on , entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 30, 2019 | Hearing |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)) Filed by Clerk |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held Judge: Richard E. Rico |
|
August 30, 2019 | Notice of Ruling | ||
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding Hearing on Motion - Other (Motion to Compel Arbitration) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion - Other (Motion to Compel Arbitration) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Richard E. Rico |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.