Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Esther Yang, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Hortencia Tobar Garcia, Nancy Alvarez, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Nancy R. Lonsdale presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2008 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: August 12, 2008Small Claims Court Trial 08/12/2008 01:45 PM D- 102
Date: May 27, 2008Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: July 16, 2010Miscellaneous Stipulation for Court-Appointed Temporary Judge Filed
Date: July 16, 2010Returned Mail: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: August 29, 2008Judgment Entered
Date: August 12, 2008Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: August 12, 2008Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed
Date: May 31, 2011Request to Pay Judgment to Court Filed for Debtor
Date: May 31, 2011Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: July 16, 2010OEX - Dropped - Motion to Vacate scheduled on July 16, 2010.
Date: June 18, 2010Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Nancy Lonsdale Filed for Esther Yang
Date: July 12, 2010Proof of Service on Order of Examination Filed
Date: May 03, 2010Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: June 02, 2011Judgment Entered
Date: July 16, 2010Small Claims Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: July 16, 2010Motion to Vacate Small Claims Judgment Filed
Date: June 14, 2010Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed
Date: May 21, 2008Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed
Date: May 03, 2010Order of Examination Issued
Date: April 29, 2010Notice to Judgment Creditor Issued and Filed
Date: May 31, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.