Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ROWLAND VS GRANTHAM (E)
A Dissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children case was filed by Rowland, Cole Garrett, against Grantham, Ashlee Erikka, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Foley, Therese M. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 14, 2016
Last Refreshed
November 18, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Schuett, Stephen D.; Stainfield, Bryan K.; Fielder, John L.; Loo, Cynthia L.;Category
Dissolution of Marriage With Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Time To Trial
10 months and 26 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2020 | hearing | Mail Returned Undelivered | |
December 05, 2019 | hearing | Mail Returned Undelivered | |
September 04, 2018 | hearing |
Notice Re Payment of Support FILED BY DCSS |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Re Payment of Support FILED BY DCSS |
|
October 11, 2017 | hearing |
Court Trial ISSUE OF TAX REFUND AND S/S Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
October 11, 2017 | hearing | Ruling | |
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Trial ISSUE OF TAX REFUND AND S/S Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
October 10, 2017 | hearing | Income and Expense Declaration | |
September 29, 2017 | hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
September 27, 2017 | hearing |
Judgment of Dissolution PARTIAL JUDGMENT STATUS ENDS 9/27/17 SIGNED PURSUANT TO C.C.P 635 Judge: Stainfield, Bryan K. |
|
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dissolution PARTIAL JUDGMENT STATUS ENDS 9/27/17 SIGNED PURSUANT TO C.C.P 635 Judge: Stainfield, Bryan K. |
|
September 14, 2017 | hearing | Mediated Agreement - Settlement of Issues | |
September 14, 2017 | hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
September 06, 2017 | hearing |
Settlement Conference Statement HRG 09/14/17 |
|
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Statement HRG 09/14/17 |
|
August 17, 2017 | hearing |
Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Trial Status Conference Hearing Date: 9/14/17 Hearing Time: 1:30 PM Department/Division: MC |
|
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Trial Status Conference Hearing Date: 9/14/17 Hearing Time: 1:30 PM Department/Division: MC |
|
July 31, 2017 | hearing | At-Issue Memorandum | |
July 26, 2017 | hearing | Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure | |
February 01, 2017 | hearing | Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure | |
January 31, 2017 | hearing | Response | |
January 31, 2017 | hearing | Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted | |
January 31, 2017 | hearing | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
January 11, 2017 | hearing |
Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied / Payment Arrangement TOTAL FEES $520 Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied / Payment Arrangement TOTAL FEES $520 Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
January 06, 2017 | hearing |
Hearing on Waiver of Fees PET FW (2ND REQUEST) FEES: $520.00 Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Waiver of Fees PET FW (2ND REQUEST) FEES: $520.00 Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
January 05, 2017 | hearing | Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation | |
December 20, 2016 | hearing |
Mediation Agreement and Order HRG 12/20/16 Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
December 20, 2016 | hearing |
Request for Order - Petitioner PET MOD C/C C/V C/S CONSOLIDATE 1 MINOR NO SERVICE Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Petitioner PET MOD C/C C/V C/S CONSOLIDATE 1 MINOR NO SERVICE Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Mediation Agreement and Order HRG 12/20/16 Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
December 19, 2016 | hearing |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered HRG 01/06/17 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
December 19, 2016 | hearing | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered HRG 01/06/17 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
December 13, 2016 | hearing |
Mediation Appointment SET BY FATHER |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Mediation Appointment SET BY FATHER |
|
December 07, 2016 | hearing |
Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied/Incomplete TOTAL FEES DUE $520.00 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied/Incomplete TOTAL FEES DUE $520.00 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
December 02, 2016 | hearing | Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation | |
December 02, 2016 | hearing |
Hearing on Waiver of Fees PET FW FEES: $520.00 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Waiver of Fees PET FW FEES: $520.00 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
November 15, 2016 | hearing |
Temporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305) GRANTED W/MODIFICATION Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
November 15, 2016 | hearing |
Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) PET MOD C/C C/V C/S CONSOLIDATE ADDRESSING 1 MINOR |
|
November 15, 2016 | hearing |
Ex Parte Hearing PET EX PARTE C/C C/V VISITATION ORDERS ADDRESSING 1 MINOR |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) PET MOD C/C C/V C/S CONSOLIDATE ADDRESSING 1 MINOR |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Temporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305) GRANTED W/MODIFICATION Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing PET EX PARTE C/C C/V VISITATION ORDERS ADDRESSING 1 MINOR |
|
November 14, 2016 | hearing |
Ex Parte Compliance Hearing Date: 11/15/16 Hearing Time: 11:00AM Hearing Department/Division:MC |
|
November 14, 2016 | hearing |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered HRG 12/02/16 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
November 14, 2016 | hearing | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
November 14, 2016 | hearing | Summons Issued and Filed | |
November 14, 2016 | hearing | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered HRG 12/02/16 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Compliance Hearing Date: 11/15/16 Hearing Time: 11:00AM Hearing Department/Division:MC |