Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) 43-Cv Other Petition - Civil Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Cervantes, Gina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCervantes, Gina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 03, 2023 |
Category43-Cv Other Petition - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
88719Notic00192b
Date: December 20, 202388404Order0073f0
Date: December 14, 202387532Notic017d98
Date: November 30, 202387532Amend00d511
Date: November 30, 202386811Proof01dea5
Date: November 16, 202386811Amend027370
Date: November 16, 202386811Decla0061fc
Date: November 16, 202386010Verif00f650
Date: November 03, 202386010Civil01bddc
Date: November 03, 202386010Notic02e55f
Date: November 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2023 | Hearing | Notice of Filing Payee's Signature on Order for Approval for Transfer of Payment Rights | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | 88719Notic00192b | |
December 19, 2023 | Hearing |
Order Granting Petition for Application of Transfer of Structured Settlement Agreement Judge: Cervantes, Gina M. |
|
December 18, 2023 | Hearing |
Petition to Approve Transfer Structured Settlmnt Pymnt Rts IN REGARDS TO: Judge: Cervantes, Gina M. |
|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition to Approve Transfer Structured Settlement Pymnt Rts 12/18/2023 Petition to Approve Transfer Structured Settlmnt Pymnt Rts IN REGARDS TO: |
|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | 88404Order0073f0 | |
November 30, 2023 | Hearing | Notice to Settling Attorney | |
November 30, 2023 | Hearing |
Exhibits in Support Amended Exhibit B to Petition for Approval for Transfer |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice to Settling Attorney | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibits in Support Amended Exhibit B to Petition for Approval for Transfer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.