Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Kohler, Gregory J, against Gonzalez , Octavio, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Smith, T presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, T Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 15, 2023 |
Category07-Cv Business Tort - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 11, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: April 03, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: August 21, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: February 15, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: December 04, 2023Application for Default Judgment Hrg 4-25-2024
Date: April 15, 2024Default Setting Card Hrg 4-25-2024
Date: April 15, 2024Request for Dismissal - DOES 1-100
Date: April 02, 2024Proposed Final Judgment
Date: April 02, 2024Application for Default Judgment
Date: April 02, 2024Default Setting Card
Date: April 02, 2024CMC Statement (hrg T-2 Apr 3)
Date: March 19, 2024Amended CMC Statement (hrg 2-15-2024)
Date: February 02, 2024(BCV-23-102684 TMS) CMC Statement hrg 2-15-2024
Date: January 30, 2024Summons
Date: August 15, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 15, 2023Proof of Service - Octavio Gonzalez
Date: September 08, 2023Request for Entry of Default
Date: October 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference Cont'd from 02/15/24, 04/03/24 |
|
June 13, 2024 | Hearing |
Further Case Management Conference Cont'd from 02/15/24, 04/03/24 Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Proposed Final Judgment -- revised (post hearing) | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Default 04/25/2024 Default Prove-up |
|
April 25, 2024 | Hearing |
Default Prove-up Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Default Setting Card Prove-up hearing set 4-25-2024 / 8:30 am / D-T2 |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Application for Default Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations in Support Thereof | |
April 15, 2024 | Hearing | Application for Default Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations in Support Thereof | |
April 15, 2024 | Hearing |
Default Setting Card Prove-up hearing set 4-25-2024 / 8:30 am / D-T2 |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Application for Default Judgment Hrg 4-25-2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.