Case Last Refreshed: 6 days ago
Alvarez, Maria, Cecilio Guzman Viveros On Behalf Of All Persons Similarly Situated, Gilberto Serrato Moreno On Behalf Of All Persons Similarly Situated, Isaac Rodriguez On Behalf Of All Persons Similarly Situated, Isaac Rodriguez, On Behalf Of The State Of California, As A Private Attorney General, (total of 11) See All filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Bhowmik, Aparajit, Blumenthal, Norman B., De Blouw, Nicholas J, Norde, Kyle Roald, Puche, Serigo J., (total of 5) See All against Feghali Foods, Feghali Foods, A Corporation, represented by Franco Chavez, O Vanessa, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Smith, T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2023 |
Category15-Cv Other Employment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Complaint
Date: January 17, 2023Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: May 03, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 17, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: July 17, 2023Order to Show Cause
Date: January 18, 2023p-POS_First Amended Complaint
Date: April 17, 2024p-FAC-FINAL - REVISED V2
Date: April 12, 2024p-POS_First Amended Complaint
Date: April 12, 2024p-POS_Joint Stip for Leave to File FAC
Date: April 04, 2024Stip for Leave to File FAC (FINAL)
Date: April 04, 2024Summons
Date: January 17, 2023p-Complaint
Date: January 17, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2023p-pos-summons
Date: February 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference Status re Arbitration Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
July 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Status re Arbitration |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice Proof of service -- Caption does not conform exact to complaint. Review verbiage as to all parties including the " does". Please ensure caption conforms exact to operative complaint. |
|
April 17, 2024 | Hearing |
Proof of Service as to First Amended Complaint |
|
April 17, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice Proof of service -- Caption does not conform exact to complaint. Review verbiage as to all parties including the " does". Please ensure caption conforms exact to operative complaint. |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service as to First Amended Complaint |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | p-POS_First Amended Complaint | |
April 12, 2024 | Hearing | First Amended Complaint | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | p-FAC-FINAL - REVISED V2 | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | p-POS_First Amended Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.