Case Last Refreshed: 19 hours ago
Biane, Jean-Pierre, Jean-Pierre Biane In His Capacity As Trustee Of The J.P. Biane Living Trust Dated November 24, 2021, filed a(n) 02-Cv Writ Of Mandate-Civil Unlimited case against County Of Kern, represented by Petray, Andrea L, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Foley, Therese presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoley, Therese Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2022 |
Category02-Cv Writ Of Mandate-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Demurrer
Date: February 22, 2024Case Management Statement
Date: April 10, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 17, 2023Ruling
Date: March 15, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: November 16, 2023Ruling
Date: October 31, 2023Ruling
Date: October 17, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: June 20, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: April 25, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 10, 2024Further Case Management Conference
Date: February 22, 2024Demurrer First Amended Complaint
Date: September 12, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: June 15, 2023pos
Date: April 25, 2024CMS
Date: April 10, 2024POS
Date: April 10, 2024POS - SIGNED ORDER
Date: March 28, 2024POS
Date: March 26, 2024PO - DEMURRER
Date: March 26, 2024lodge
Date: February 26, 2024Kern County - Stipulation and Protective Order
Date: February 23, 2024POS - 2206.055 - REPLY ISO DEMURRER
Date: February 14, 20243QP7093
Date: February 14, 2024Case Management Statement (Hrg 2024.02.22)
Date: February 07, 2024CMS
Date: February 07, 20242206.055 - POS - CMS (2-22 CMC)
Date: February 07, 2024oppo
Date: February 07, 2024Pages from ORDER
Date: January 26, 2024POS
Date: January 26, 20243Q66097.DOCX
Date: January 26, 2024NOL
Date: January 26, 2024TED DEC
Date: January 26, 2024RJN
Date: January 26, 2024NTC
Date: January 26, 2024MEMO
Date: January 26, 2024POS - Stip and Order - 2206.055
Date: December 12, 20233QD3081
Date: December 06, 20232023.01.05 Proof of Service
Date: January 11, 20233P24350
Date: March 17, 2023POS - resp rfp
Date: March 17, 202378003Notic00510d
Date: June 26, 202378004Proof001b84
Date: June 26, 2023RJN
Date: August 15, 2023POS
Date: August 14, 2023Dec of ALP
Date: August 14, 2023ntc of demurrer
Date: August 14, 2023Memo
Date: August 14, 2023NOL
Date: August 14, 2023Order
Date: August 14, 2023Exs. 3-7 to RJN
Date: August 15, 202381751Plain007869
Date: August 30, 2023reply
Date: September 06, 2023Exs. 3-7 to RJN
Date: September 06, 202385054Secon0050f0
Date: October 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference continued from 11/06/2023; 02/22/2024; 04/25/2024 |
|
June 26, 2024 | Hearing |
Further Case Management Conference continued from 11/06/2023; 02/22/2024; 04/25/2024 Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
April 25, 2024 | Hearing |
Further Case Management Conference Continued from 11/06/2023,02/22/2024 Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference 04/25/2024 Further Case Management Conference Continued from 11/06/2023,02/22/2024 |
|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | pos | |
April 24, 2024 | Hearing |
Proof of Service of Amended Petition |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Amended Petition |
|
April 20, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024-04-19 Third Amended Verified Petition | |
April 19, 2024 | Hearing |
Amended Complaint Third Amended Petition for Writ of Mandate |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Third Amended Petition for Writ of Mandate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.