Case Last Refreshed: 5 hours ago
Powell, Tyna, Wasco Recreation And Park District, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Clark, Matthew C, against City Of Wasco, County Of Kern, Wasco Recreation And Park District, Wasco Tigersharks Swim Club, represented by Camy, William E, Kellar, Michael C, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2022 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: April 10, 2024Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: May 06, 2024Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 17, 2024Ruling
Date: March 22, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 17, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: April 11, 2023First Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: February 08, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: January 09, 2023Demurrer
Date: January 09, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: December 13, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 27, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 08, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: August 09, 2022Further Case Management Conference
Date: October 11, 2022Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: May 26, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 19, 2022Order to Show Cause
Date: February 10, 2022Complaint
Date: February 09, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 15, 2023Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: March 07, 2024RFD Powell
Date: April 22, 2024Powell - Reply to Opp to MSJ
Date: April 13, 2024Powell -Evidentiary Objections
Date: April 13, 2024Powell - Response to District Sep. Stmt.
Date: April 13, 2024SAC51122.6522074.Opp_to_Wasco_Tiger_Sharks__HDIs_Ex_Parte_to_move_MSJ
Date: April 09, 2024SAC51122.6522073._of_WEC_ISO_Opp_to_WTS__HDIs_Ex_Parte
Date: April 09, 2024Powell - Ex Parte Application.04.10.2024
Date: April 09, 2024SAC50922 -ioe
Date: April 04, 2024SAC50922- Memorandum
Date: April 04, 2024SAC50922- Objection
Date: April 04, 2024SAC50922- Separate Statement
Date: April 04, 2024Proposed Order Continuing Trial.docx
Date: March 27, 2024Stipulation to Continue Trial
Date: March 27, 202494285Notic00a0b8
Date: March 20, 2024Ntc Settlement
Date: March 12, 202493633Notic009f23
Date: March 11, 2024RFD - COW
Date: March 08, 202493336PROPO017d85
Date: March 06, 202493336EXPAR005fcb
Date: March 06, 202493236Motio004f04
Date: March 05, 2024RFD - Tiger Sharks
Date: February 05, 2024Decl. Joaquin Castillo Support MSJ - Final
Date: February 03, 2024Notice to Clerk of Intent to File MSJ
Date: January 18, 2024Cvil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 09, 2022Summons
Date: February 09, 2022Ntc of Action - Medi-Cal
Date: February 11, 2022Powell POS to Wasco Rec and Parks
Date: April 05, 2022Powell POS to City of Wasco
Date: April 05, 2022Powell POS to County of Kern
Date: April 05, 2022SAC29738. Answer
Date: April 14, 202256359Order00ad46
Date: April 18, 2022SAC29778. Cross Complaint
Date: April 19, 2022SAC29778B Summons
Date: April 20, 2022Ntc of Change of Firm Name
Date: June 15, 2022RFD - COK
Date: July 01, 2022CMC Stmt
Date: July 19, 2022Am to Complaint - Doe 11 - Wasco Tigersharks
Date: July 19, 2022Ntc Posting Jury Fees
Date: July 19, 2022SAC32338. Jury Fees
Date: July 25, 2022SAC32338. CMS
Date: July 25, 202260945Notic01a604
Date: July 26, 202260945CaseM00c880
Date: July 26, 2022CMC Stmt
Date: September 22, 202263959CaseM00f730
Date: September 26, 202263960CaseM007d49
Date: September 26, 2022SAC46588B
Date: November 17, 2023SAC46588.declaration
Date: November 17, 2023Cross-Defendant Answer To Cross-Complaint
Date: October 10, 2022CMC Stmt
Date: November 17, 202266886CaseM00f5fb
Date: November 23, 2022CMC Stmt. (for 12-13) (02863110x9DF46)
Date: November 28, 2022CMC Stmt
Date: December 19, 2022SAC36494 CMS
Date: December 21, 2022SAC36510 Declaration
Date: December 22, 2022SAC36510 Opposition
Date: December 22, 2022ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: December 23, 2022Powel - HDI Reply to Opposition to Demurrer
Date: December 27, 2022ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 202268813CaseM0041a2
Date: January 05, 2023SAC39264 CMS
Date: March 23, 2023Notice_of_Change_of_Address
Date: July 31, 2023WTSC and HDI Responses to Districts SSUMF
Date: August 01, 2023Declaration of Jonathan Moradifar
Date: August 01, 2023Opposition to MSA
Date: August 01, 2023Declaration of Joaquin Castillo
Date: August 01, 2023WTSC and HDI SSMUF
Date: August 01, 2023response
Date: August 10, 2023reply
Date: August 10, 2023decl
Date: August 10, 2023reply 2
Date: August 10, 2023obj
Date: August 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference JT = 05/20/24 T/E 5 DAYS - - cont'd from 5/17/24 per Order filed 4/4/24 |
|
September 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E = 5 DAYS JURY FOR PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT CITY OF WASCO - - cont'd from 5/20/24 per Order filed 4/4/24 |
|
August 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference FCMC: 09/09/2024 9am // JT: 090924 9am// T/E: 5 DAYS (D-H) -- cont'd from 4/19/24 per Order filed 4/4/24 |
|
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E = 5 DAYS JURY FOR PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT CITY OF WASCO |
|
May 20, 2024 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E = 5 DAYS JURY FOR PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT CITY OF WASCO Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
May 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference JT = 05/20/24 T/E 5 DAYS |
|
May 17, 2024 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference JT = 05/20/24 T/E 5 DAYS Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 03/22/2024 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC 3.1385 as to Plaintiff's Complaint filed 02/09/22, ONLY |
|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order from Fifth District Court of Appeal filed The "Petition for Peremptory Writ of Mandate/Prohibition," filed on January 2024 is denied. |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) Request for Dismissal as to Plaintiff Complaint Only |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.