Case Last Refreshed: 10 hours ago
Kern High School District, V., G., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Gonzalez, Danay S., Rojas-Iniguez, Danay S., against Anderson, Steven, Assistant Principal Melissa Rizo, Dean Of Students Steven Anderson, Kern High School District, Rizo, Melisa, (total of 7) See All represented by Alimi, Nazli, Ovitz, Eric David, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 29, 2021 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)
Date: April 24, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: February 28, 2022Ruling
Date: April 12, 2024Ruling
Date: May 02, 2024Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: May 03, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: December 15, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: September 01, 2021Final Case Management Conference
Date: May 24, 2024Jury Trial
Date: May 28, 2024Trial Setting Conference
Date: March 10, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: September 01, 2021Ruling
Date: May 02, 2024Trial Setting Conference
Date: April 24, 2023Order to Appear
Date: April 24, 2023Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: July 28, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: September 07, 2021Order to Show Cause
Date: September 01, 2021Ruling
Date: February 02, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 31, 202305-01-24 Cert. of Progress re MSC
Date: May 01, 202404-19-24 Proposed Order re Ex Parte 2
Date: April 19, 202404-17-24 (Proposed) Order re Ex Parte
Date: April 17, 202404-17-24 Ex Parte Mtn w-Exhibits
Date: April 17, 202404-16-24 Ntc of Entry of Order re MSC
Date: April 17, 202404-08-24 Stip to Cont. MSC signed
Date: April 08, 2024CMC_Stmt_of_Defs_1_
Date: February 12, 2022Ntc_of_Posting_Jury_Fees_of_Defs
Date: February 12, 2022XC_of_KHSD_to_Velasquez_Arredondo
Date: April 07, 2022Summons_XC_Velasquez_Arredondo_
Date: April 07, 202205-13-22 Plts MTC Further Disc. Resp (complete)
Date: May 13, 202205-13-22 Plts SS in Support of MTC Further Disc.
Date: May 13, 202205-13-22 [Proposed] Oder Granting MTC
Date: May 13, 202207-06-22 Stmt in Supp of Plt's MTC Further Resp to RTP#2
Date: July 06, 202207-06-22 MTC Further RTP#2 Resp.
Date: July 06, 202207-06-22 MTC Further RTP#2 Resp [Proposed] Order
Date: July 06, 20222084979 - Opposition to Motion to Compel (RPD) new
Date: July 15, 202207-25-22 Plt's Reply to Def's Opp to Plts MTC RTP#2
Date: July 21, 202207-29-22 Stip & [Proposed] Order re Protective Order
Date: July 29, 202207-29-22 Proposed Order (Cvr Sheet)
Date: July 29, 202208-17-22 Ntc of Entry of Order
Date: August 17, 2022POS_of_Summons_Brian_Velasquez_Arredondo_
Date: November 11, 2022Ntc_Entry_Default_Arredondo_
Date: November 16, 2022Ntc_Entry_Default_Arredondo_
Date: November 18, 202201-30-23 Stip to Cont. Trial & [Proposed] Order
Date: January 30, 202301-31-23 Stip to Cont. Trial
Date: January 31, 202301-31-23 [Proposed] Order re Stip to Cont. Trial
Date: January 31, 202302-24-23 Plt's CMC Stmt - G.V. v. K.H.S.D.
Date: February 24, 2023CMS_3_6_23_FINAL
Date: March 06, 2023Ntc_Entry_Default_Arredondo_2_
Date: March 06, 202308-04-23 [Proposed] Order re Petition for Terminating GAL
Date: August 04, 202308-04-23 Petition for Order Terminating GAL for Plt.
Date: August 04, 202308-15-23 Ntc of Entry of Order re GAL
Date: August 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 04/12/2024 Jury Trial T/E: 8 DAYS. JURY FOR BOTH SIDES. |
|
May 28, 2024 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E: 8 DAYS. JURY FOR BOTH SIDES. Judge: Zulfa, David |
|
May 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 04/12/2024 Final Case Management Conference JT: 05/28/24 0930 DIV J T/E: 8 DAYS. JURY FOR BOTH SIDES. |
|
May 24, 2024 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 05/28/24 0930 DIV J T/E: 8 DAYS. JURY FOR BOTH SIDES. Judge: Zulfa, David |
|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS Set from 04/18/24 hearing |
|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 04/12/2024 Mandatory Settlement Conference Jury Trial set for 5/28/2024 in Div J- Time Estimate 8 Days |
|
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 05/02/2024 Ruling |
|
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 05/02/2024 ruling #2 |
|
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Unconditional as to Plaintiff's Complaint, only. |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | 05-01-24 Cert. of Progress re MSC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.