Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Carino, Justin, Justin Carino, Individually And On Behalf Of Other Persons Similarly Situated, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Bollinger, Jeremy F, against Adventist Health Delano, Adventist Health Systems West, represented by Nilsson, Micah K, Smith, T Mark, Thomas, Justin L, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2020 |
Category15-Cv Other Employment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Management Conference
Date: June 07, 2021Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement
Date: June 27, 2024Ruling
Date: October 30, 2023Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: November 28, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 20, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 03, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: May 12, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: August 17, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 28, 2022Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: March 23, 2021Order to Show Cause
Date: December 08, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: October 05, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 02, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: December 08, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: February 28, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 02, 2021Further Case Management Conference
Date: June 01, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 22, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 17, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: April 30, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 16, 2022Revised [Proposed] Order Granting Preliminary Approval (CARINO) - FINAL
Date: February 29, 2024Notice of Related Case (2.21.24)
Date: February 22, 2024Joint Status Conf Statement - hrg 3.9.22 (Final)
Date: February 25, 2022Joint Status Conf Statement - hrg 3.9.22 - revised (Final)
Date: March 02, 2022Joint Status Conference Statement
Date: November 23, 2022Ntc of Change of Handling Atty - FINAL
Date: January 06, 2023Stipulation and [Proposed] Order
Date: September 20, 20233 - Declaration of Jeremy Bollinger ISO Prelim Approval FINAL
Date: October 20, 20237 - Request for Judicial Notice ISO Preliminary Approval
Date: October 20, 20231 - Notice of Motion for Prelim App (Carino)
Date: October 20, 20236 - Declaration of Jodey Lawrence ISO Preliminary Approval
Date: October 20, 20238 - Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval (CARINO) - FINAL
Date: October 20, 20235 - Declaration of Justin Carino ISO Prelim Approval (Carino)
Date: October 20, 20232 - Memo of Ps and As (Carino)
Date: October 20, 20234 - Declaration of Dennis Moss ISO Prelim Approval (CARINO)
Date: October 20, 20239 - PROOF OF SERVICE (Carino v. Adventist Prelim App)
Date: October 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference 02/28/2024 Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 30, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference see minutes 02/28/2024 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference 02/28/2024 Case Management Conference see minutes 02/28/2024 |
|
March 01, 2024 | Hearing |
Order Revised order granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action and PAGA Settlement Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Revised order granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action and PAGA Settlement |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Revised [Proposed] Order Granting Preliminary Approval (CARINO) - FINAL | |
February 28, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference continued from 11/28/2023 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference 02/28/2024 Case Management Conference continued from 11/28/2023 |
|
February 22, 2024 | Hearing | Notice of Related Case(s) | |
February 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice RE: Notice of Related Case. Please see attached rejection notice. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.