Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TRAMPE VS CARMONA ET AL
A 22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Lampe, David R. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 02, 2016
Last Refreshed
November 18, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Clark, Thomas S.;Category
22-CV Auto - Civil Unlimited
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
1 year, 7 months and 4 days
Time To Trial
1 year, 8 months and 5 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2019 | hearing |
Association of Attorney Original Attorney: Craig Johnson Associating Attorney: Boyd C Johnson |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Association of Attorney Original Attorney: Craig Johnson Associating Attorney: Boyd C Johnson |
|
July 09, 2018 | hearing |
Jury Trial 4-5 days; defendant request jury Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
July 09, 2018 | hearing |
Final Case Management Conference 4-5 days; defendant request jury Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference 4-5 days; defendant request jury Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 4-5 days; defendant request jury Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
June 08, 2018 | hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference 4-5 days; defendant request jury; trial in D11 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference 4-5 days; defendant request jury; trial in D11 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
June 07, 2018 | hearing |
Stipulation and Order IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is ordered to binding arbitration pursuant to the terms and agreements outlined in this Stipulation and that the Trial, Final Case Management Conference and MSC dates shall be vacated. ***JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE***6-7-18 Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is ordered to binding arbitration pursuant to the terms and agreements outlined in this Stipulation and that the Trial, Final Case Management Conference and MSC dates shall be vacated. ***JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE***6-7-18 Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
June 01, 2018 | hearing | Settlement Conference Statement | |
November 14, 2017 | hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys Former Attorney: Timothy Fitzhugh Substituting Attorney: Marshall Frasher |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys Former Attorney: Timothy Fitzhugh Substituting Attorney: Marshall Frasher |
|
September 22, 2017 | hearing | Association of Attorney | |
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Association of Attorney | |
July 28, 2017 | hearing | Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf | |
July 25, 2017 | hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
July 06, 2017 | hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
June 22, 2017 | hearing |
Ruling/Certificate of Progress IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Case Management Conference hearing be re-set for July 25, 2017, at 8:30 a.m., in department 11. ****JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE****6/22/17 Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ruling/Certificate of Progress IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Case Management Conference hearing be re-set for July 25, 2017, at 8:30 a.m., in department 11. ****JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE****6/22/17 Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
June 21, 2017 | hearing | Certificate of Progress | |
June 01, 2017 | hearing | Facsimile Transmission Cover Sheet | |
June 01, 2017 | hearing | Ruling | |
May 19, 2017 | hearing | Case Management Statement | |
April 21, 2017 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
April 17, 2017 | hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice Date of Case Management Conference is incorrect |
|
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Electronic Rejection Notice Date of Case Management Conference is incorrect |
|
April 13, 2017 | hearing |
Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees Notice of Posting Jury Fees |
|
April 13, 2017 | hearing | Demand for Jury Trial | |
April 13, 2017 | hearing |
Answer to Complaint AS TO YVONNE CARMONA AND JUAN CARMONA |
|
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint AS TO YVONNE CARMONA AND JUAN CARMONA |
|
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury Trial | |
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees Notice of Posting Jury Fees |
|
April 10, 2017 | hearing |
Ruling/Certificate of Progress ORDERED that the Case Management Conference hearing be re-set for June 5, 2017 at 8:30 AM in Department 11. ***JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE*** 4-10-17 Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ruling/Certificate of Progress ORDERED that the Case Management Conference hearing be re-set for June 5, 2017 at 8:30 AM in Department 11. ***JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE*** 4-10-17 Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
April 05, 2017 | hearing | Certificate of Progress | |
April 03, 2017 | hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint As to Juan Carmona. Personal service. |
|
April 03, 2017 | hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint As to Jaqueline Yvonne Carmona. Sub service. |
|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint As to Juan Carmona. Personal service. |
|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint As to Jaqueline Yvonne Carmona. Sub service. |
|
February 10, 2017 | hearing |
Ruling/Certificate of Progress ORDERED that OSC- CRC 3.110 be continued to April 21, 2017 at 8:30 AM in Department 11. ***JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE*** February 10, 2017. Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ruling/Certificate of Progress ORDERED that OSC- CRC 3.110 be continued to April 21, 2017 at 8:30 AM in Department 11. ***JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE*** February 10, 2017. Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
February 08, 2017 | hearing | Certificate of Progress | |
November 14, 2016 | hearing |
Summons Issued and Filed RETURNED VIA ATTORNEY'S FOLDER |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued and Filed RETURNED VIA ATTORNEY'S FOLDER |
|
November 10, 2016 | hearing |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted AS TO WERTHER TRAMPE Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted AS TO WERTHER TRAMPE Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
November 02, 2016 | hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
November 02, 2016 | hearing |
Request to Waive Court Fees AS TO WERTHER TRAMPE |
|
November 02, 2016 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/15/17 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11 |
|
November 02, 2016 | hearing | Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) | |
November 02, 2016 | hearing | Complaint | |
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/15/17 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11 |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees AS TO WERTHER TRAMPE |