Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wilson Jon Leslie, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Sullivan Jerold D., against Access Medical Imaging, Aspen Medical Resources, Brotman Medical Anesthesia Group, California Hand Surgery & Orthopedic, Diagnostic Imaging Services, (total of 11) See All represented by Sparks Jerry R., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rupert A. Byrdsong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRupert A. Byrdsong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management160 days |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2018 |
CategoryOther Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: September 19, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: September 19, 2018COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER
Date: September 19, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference -
Date: October 18, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 08, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 18, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 14, 2019Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: February 14, 2019Answer
Date: March 28, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: February 26, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: March 29, 2019Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: March 29, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 29, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: June 03, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 24, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: June 27, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 13, 2019Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: November 15, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEROLD "GENE" SULLIVAN
Date: November 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: December 13, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: June 08, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: March 15, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: June 21, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: July 19, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: July 20, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: July 22, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED
Date: September 27, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: September 28, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: September 29, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 29, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: September 29, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: October 04, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: October 05, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: November 21, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 21, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: December 21, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: December 23, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 22, 2022Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: March 09, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: March 14, 2023Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 14, 2023Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 14, 2023Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: March 17, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: March 14, 2023Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 20, 2023Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 02, 2023Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: May 02, 2023Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: May 02, 2023Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: May 03, 2023Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 09, 2023Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: May 24, 2023Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Diagnostic Imaging Services; On the Complaint filed by JON LESLIE WILSON on
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Default entered as to Brotman Medical Anesthesia Group; On the Complaint filed by JON LESLIE WILSON on
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Default entered as to Oxnard Valley Medical Group, Inc; On the Complaint filed by JON LESLIE WILSON on
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Default entered as to Access Medical Imaging; On the Complaint filed by JON LESLIE WILSON on
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: California Hand Surgery & Orthopedic (Defendant); Wilshire Surgicenter Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Tri Star Wilshire Orthopedic; On the Complaint filed by JON LESLIE WILSON on
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Tri Star Wilshire Orthopedic; On the Complaint filed by JON LESLIE WILSON on
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Tri Star Wilshire Orthopedic; On the Complaint filed by JON LESLIE WILSON on
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Default entered as to Access Medical Imaging; On the Complaint filed by JON LESLIE WILSON on
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Default entered as to Diagnostic Imaging Services; On the Complaint filed by JON LESLIE WILSON on
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Wilshire Surgicenter, Inc. Peremptory Challenge Aga...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 06, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 15, 2019Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: November 19, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 20, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/17/2020
Date: March 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 26, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 17, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/26/2020
Date: March 26, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: June 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: October 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: April 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: August 24, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 09, 2021Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Wilshire Surgicenter Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Jerold "Gene" Sullivan) Filed by Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by California Hand Surgery & Orthopedic (Defendant); Wilshire Surgicenter Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by California Hand Surgery & Orthopedic (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Default Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected) Filed by Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected) Filed by Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions against Sparks Law Firm for...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Default Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Default Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Access Medical Imaging; On the Complaint filed by JON LESLIE WILSON on
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Diagnostic Imaging Services; On the Complaint filed by JON LESLIE WILSON on
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Default entered as to Aspen Medical Resources; On the Complaint filed by JON LESLIE WILSON on
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice (of continued Case Management Conference) Filed by Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Wilshire Surgicenter, Inc. Peremptory Challenge Aga...))
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions against Sparks Law Firm for...))
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/17/2020)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/26/2020)
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Notice (of continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Jerold "Gene" Sullivan)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Declaration of Jerold "Gene" Sullivan; Filed by: Jon Leslie Wilson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: California Hand Surgery & Orthopedic (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Tri Star Wilshire Orthopedic; On the Complaint filed by JON LESLIE WILSON on
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.