Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Galeano Jorge, Ramirez Rosa, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Spielberger Diana Barbara, Statman Jay, against Garcia Maribel Munoz, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gregory Keosian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory Keosian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management90 days |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Jay Statman (Attorney)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jorge Galeano (Plaintiff); Rosa Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Rosa Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jorge Galeano (Plaintiff); Rosa Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jorge Galeano (Plaintiff); Rosa Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Rosa Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 25, 2022Notice of chapter 7 discharge; Filed by: Jorge Galeano (Plaintiff); Rosa Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: September 06, 2018ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -
Date: September 06, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: September 06, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 11, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 14, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 25, 2018Association of Attorney - Notice of Association of Counsel
Date: October 24, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 26, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 16, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: December 05, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: December 10, 2018Case Management Order
Date: January 18, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: January 18, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 29, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: February 27, 2019Notice of Deposit - Jury - Notice of Deposit - Jury Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: February 13, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT
Date: April 23, 2019Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: November 19, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED
Date: December 30, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: January 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED)
Date: January 08, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: March 09, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 23, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020
Date: April 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: August 04, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: November 20, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: January 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)
Date: February 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)
Date: August 09, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAY STATMAN RE STATUSOFBANKRUPTCY
Date: December 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)
Date: February 09, 2022Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: February 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)
Date: February 24, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: February 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL / DEFAULT PROVE-UP)
Date: May 25, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CHAPTER 7 PROCEEDINGS
Date: May 31, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: May 25, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: June 29, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL / DEFAULT PROVE-UP)
Date: June 29, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CHAPTER 7 DISCHARGE
Date: September 27, 2022Notice of Association of Counsel
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Set Aside Default)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Declaration and Order re: Advance Jury Fees
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF JAY STATMAN RE STATUSOFBANKRUPTCY)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury (Notice of Posting Jury Fees)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted))
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Notice (OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to set aside default and file Answer to complaint)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial / Default Prove-Up))
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy) of )
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Notice (of continued status conference)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury (Notice of Posting Jury Fees)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Set Aside Default)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to set aside default and file Answer to complaint)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Notice (OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted))
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/15/2020)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Notice (of continued status conference)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy) of 02/09/2022)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF JAY STATMAN RE STATUSOFBANKRUPTCY)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jorge Galeano (Plaintiff); Rosa Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Default entered as to Maribel Munoz Garcia; On the Complaint filed by JORGE GALEANO ET AL on
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by: Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury Notice of Posting Jury Fees; Filed by: Maribel Munoz Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: Rosa Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Jorge Galeano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Maribel Munoz Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.