Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Patterson Jarvis, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Cohen Darren Michael, Morton Benjamin Taliaferro, against Budget Wireless California Llc, represented by Jang-Busby Travis Kai, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Kenneth R. Freeman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth R. Freeman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2018 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Order Authorizing Electronic Service (Case Anywhere); Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Budget Wireless California LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by: Budget Wireless California LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement; Filed by: Jarvis Patterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Budget Wireless California LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Checklist for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 13, 2023Order - Order Authorizing Electronic Service (Case Anywhere)
Date: January 11, 2019Complaint -
Date: August 31, 2018Summons -
Date: August 31, 2018Notice of Case Assignment -
Date: August 31, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 14, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 18, 2018Other - - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM)
Date: September 18, 2018Other - - NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM)
Date: September 26, 2018Other - - DEFENDANT BUDGET WIRELESS CALIFORNIA, LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: September 26, 2018Other - - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION
Date: September 26, 2018Status Conference Statement - Joint Initial Status Conference Class Action Statement
Date: December 31, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Initial Status Conference;)
Date: January 11, 2019Case Management Order
Date: January 11, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 28, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 04, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 19, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION HEARING AND RELATED DATES
Date: October 02, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 02, 2019Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: December 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS CLAIM...)
Date: December 19, 2019Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: April 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CONTINUANCE;)
Date: April 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUED HEARING)
Date: December 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 20, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: April 20, 2021Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT
Date: July 28, 2021Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)
Date: July 29, 2021Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 03, 2021Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement
Date: August 17, 2021Order - CHECKLIST FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT
Date: September 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT;)
Date: February 15, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: February 15, 2022Order - PRELIMINARY APPROVAL ORDER
Date: February 16, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: July 06, 2022Judgment - FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: July 22, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARY BUTLER REGARDING DISBURSEMENT
Date: April 05, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISTRIBUTION;)
Date: April 07, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: April 13, 2023Complaint
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Joint Initial Status Conference Class Action Statement
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Order Authorizing Electronic Service (Case Anywhere)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ((Initial Status Conference;))
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Petition to Compel Arbitration, Strike Class Claims, and Dismiss or Stay
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Moving Hearing on Defendant's Petition to Compel Arbitration and Related Dates)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Petition to Compel Arbitration hearing and related dates)
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Moving Hearing on Defendant's Petition to Compel Arbitration and Related Dates)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Continuance;))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Moving Hearing on Defendant's Petition to Compel Arbitration and Related Dates)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Compel Arbitration, Strike Class Claim...))
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Moving Hearing on Petition to Compel Arbitration and Related Dates)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continued Hearing))
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (of Settlement and Release Between Plaintiff and Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Vacating Order to Show Cause Hearing Set for ...))
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Checklist for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Joint Stipulation Of Settlement And Release Between Plaintiff and Defendant
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Jarvis Patterson In Support of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Joint Stipulation to Amend Class Action Complaint
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement;))
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.