Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Cook Andrea Joy, Scattered Joy Productions Inc., Meyer & Downs Llp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Good Christopher Bryan, Gustafson John Ryan, Zohar Daniel Yehuda, against Anderson Andrea, Cook A.J., Cook Andrea Joy, Scattered Joy Productions Inc., Scatterend Joy Productions Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Levine Elana Rebecca, Saltz Michael Jeffrey Esq., Manavi Jessica, Saltz Michael J. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gregory W. Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory W. Alarcon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management105 days |
Filing DateJune 15, 2018 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Motion to Disqualify Counsel - MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL OF PLAINTFF
Date: July 18, 2019SUMMONS -
Date: June 15, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 26, 2018CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET
Date: August 07, 2018DEFENDANTS' CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC.
Date: August 07, 2018DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT
Date: August 07, 2018SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: August 07, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 13, 2018ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: September 10, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: September 13, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: September 25, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 28, 2018Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Firm Address
Date: December 20, 2018Response - Response Response to Notice of Related Case
Date: February 25, 2019Separate Statement
Date: March 27, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: March 27, 2019Notice of Related Case
Date: April 04, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: April 10, 2019Reply - REPLY RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT
Date: April 10, 2019Reply - REPLY REPY IN SUPPORT OF MTC FURTHER RESPONSES TO RFP SET ONE
Date: April 16, 2019Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: May 07, 2019Motion for Protective Order
Date: May 16, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: May 21, 2019COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: June 15, 2018Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: July 02, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: July 08, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: July 09, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 12, 2019Reply - REPLY ISO MOTION
Date: July 12, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION BEING FILED
Date: July 12, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MJS
Date: July 18, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: July 22, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY)
Date: July 22, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: July 25, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: July 22, 2019Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION
Date: August 12, 2019Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST JOINT
Date: August 14, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: August 13, 2019Jury Instructions
Date: August 14, 2019Witness List - WITNESS LIST JOINT
Date: August 14, 2019Statement of the Case - STATEMENT OF THE CASE JOINT
Date: August 14, 2019Order - ORDER GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART MTN FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS
Date: August 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL)
Date: August 19, 2019Order - ORDER GRANTING MTN TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL
Date: August 20, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS BASED ON ...)
Date: November 01, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: November 04, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 30, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 03, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 24, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF LABOR BOARD PROCEEDINGS)
Date: September 01, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 15, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF LABOR BOARD PROCEEDINGS)
Date: March 25, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF ELANA R. LEVINE, ESQ. IN ADVANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: November 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF LABOR BOARD PROCEEDINGS)
Date: November 10, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 25, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 22, 2022Declaration of Notice - DECLARATION OF NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: March 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF LABOR BOARD PROCEEDINGS)
Date: April 13, 2022Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: May 13, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: June 06, 2022Reply - REPLY ISO MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL
Date: June 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: August 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: September 26, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: March 27, 2023Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 04, 2019Reply Repy In Support of MTC Further Responses to RFP Set One; Filed by: Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Reply Response to Separate Statement; Filed by:
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Reply ISO Motion; Filed by: Andrea Joy Cook (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Witness List Joint; Filed by: Andrea Joy Cook (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Andrea Joy Cook (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Andrea Joy Cook (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Address; Filed by: Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Opposition to Motion For Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Order granting mtn to disqualify counsel; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO VACATE AND RESET THE CURR...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Statement of the Case Joint; Filed by: Andrea Joy Cook (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Andrea Joy Cook (Defendant); Scatterend Joy Productions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Compel Further Discovery ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Opposition ( to Motion For Judgment on the Pleadings) Filed by Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Andrea Joy Cook (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Andrea Joy Cook (Defendant); Scattered Joy Productions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Reply (Repy In Support of MTC Further Responses to RFP Set One) Filed by Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Neil Meyer (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed by Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Order granted in part and denied in part mtn for judgment on pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Summons Filed by Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Andrea Joy Cook (Defendant); Scattered Joy Productions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Stay)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Statement of the Case (Joint) Filed by Andrea Joy Cook (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Order (granted in part and denied in part mtn for judgment on pleadings) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO STAY PROCEEDINGS BASED ON ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Andrea Joy Cook (Defendant); Scattered Joy Productions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Andrea Joy Cook (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Exhibit List (Joint) Filed by Andrea Joy Cook (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Reply ( ISO Motion) Filed by Andrea Joy Cook (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Declaration of Notice (Notice Of Case Reassignment) Filed by Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Witness List (Joint) Filed by Andrea Joy Cook (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Andrea Joy Cook (Defendant); Scattered Joy Productions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Andrea Joy Cook (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference RE Status of Labor Board Proceedings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Order (granting mtn to disqualify counsel) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference RE Status of Labor Board Proceedings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Compliance With Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Neil Meyer (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel; Hearing on Motion fo...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel; Status Conference RE...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Opposition ( TO DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel (of Plaintff)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to continue trial)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Witness List (Joint)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Reply ( ISO Motion)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO VACATE AND RESET THE CURR...))
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Notice ( of No Opposition Being Filed)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of MJS)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Opposition ( to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice ISO Their Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Opposition ( to Motion For Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Exhibit List (Joint)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF JESSICA MANAVI IN SUPPORT OF EXPARTE)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 2 OF 3 TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE OF A CONTINGENCY FEE ARRANGEMENT)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Stay))
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Opposition ( to Motion to Exclude Evidence at Trial Based on Failure to Deliver Bill of Particulars)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Reply (Repy In Support of MTC Further Responses to RFP Set One)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Declaration ( of Zohar ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion For Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Compel Further Responses ...))
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Motion to Compel; Filed by:
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Andrea Joy Cook (Defendant); Scatterend Joy Productions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Exhibit List Joint; Filed by: Andrea Joy Cook (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Response (Response to Notice of Related Case) Filed by Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Response Response to Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter on Mtn to Disqualify from ) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Daniel Y. Zohar in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Address
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Compel Further Discovery ...))
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Statement of the Case (Joint)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for Protective Order/Confidentiality)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Response (Response to Notice of Related Case)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference RE Status of Labor Board Proceedings))
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference RE Status of Labor Board Proceedings))
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel))
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Declaration of Notice (Notice Of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO STAY PROCEEDINGS BASED ON ...))
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF ELANA R. LEVINE, ESQ. IN ADVANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter on Mtn to Disqualify from ))
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Reply (ISO MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter on Mtn to Disqualify from ) of )
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference RE Status of Labor Board Proceedings))
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Order (granted in part and denied in part mtn for judgment on pleadings)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Order (granting mtn to disqualify counsel)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference RE Status of Labor Board Proceedings))
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Declaration (OF ELANA R. LEVINE, ESQ. IN ADVANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for Protective Order/Confidentiality)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF JESSICA MANAVI IN SUPPORT OF EXPARTE)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of MJS)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel (of Plaintff)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 2 OF 3 TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE OF A CONTINGENCY FEE ARRANGEMENT)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to continue trial)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Notice ( of No Opposition Being Filed)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Declaration (OF ELANA R. LEVINE, ESQ. IN ADVANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Daniel Y. Zohar in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Response (Response to Notice of Related Case)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Reply (Repy In Support of MTC Further Responses to RFP Set One)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Compel Further Discovery ...))
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF JESSICA MANAVI IN SUPPORT OF EXPARTE)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO VACATE AND RESET THE CURR...))
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for Protective Order/Confidentiality)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Opposition ( to Motion For Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Declaration ( of Zohar ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion For Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Opposition ( to Motion to Exclude Evidence at Trial Based on Failure to Deliver Bill of Particulars)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Reply ( ISO Motion)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel (of Plaintff)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Notice ( of No Opposition Being Filed)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Opposition ( to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice ISO Their Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Compel Further Responses ...))
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of MJS)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to continue trial)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Opposition ( TO DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Stay))
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Exhibit List (Joint)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Witness List (Joint)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter on Mtn to Disqualify from 08/19/19))
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 2 OF 3 TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE OF A CONTINGENCY FEE ARRANGEMENT)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Order (granting mtn to disqualify counsel)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Order (granted in part and denied in part mtn for judgment on pleadings)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel))
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO STAY PROCEEDINGS BASED ON ...))
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Statement of the Case (Joint)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference RE Status of Labor Board Proceedings))
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference RE Status of Labor Board Proceedings))
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Declaration (OF ELANA R. LEVINE, ESQ. IN ADVANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference RE Status of Labor Board Proceedings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter on Mtn to Disqualify from )) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Meyer & Downs, LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference RE Status of Labor Board Proceedings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter on Mtn to Disqualify from ) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Compel Further Responses ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.