Case Last Refreshed: 8 hours ago
Gatlin Carla, Ybarra-Telias Susan, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Howard John H., Pachowicz Mark R., Howard John Henry, Pachowicz Mark Richard, against Do Lab Inc., Gottlieb Richard, Multidisciplinary Association For Psychedelic Studies Inc., Multidisciplinary Association For Psychedelic Studies Inc. Aka Maps. Inc., Rgx Medical, (total of 6) See All represented by Briscoe J. Jackson, Custer Charles S., Farinaro James, Hugret Spencer P., Nathan Casey Benjamin, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Ruth Ann Kwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRuth Ann Kwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management246 days |
Filing DateMay 21, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions91 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time771 days |
Answer
Date: January 22, 2020Objection (to Declaration)
Date: June 19, 2020SUMMONS -
Date: May 21, 2018COMPLRINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. WRONGFUL IDERTH; 2. SURVIVAL ACTION
Date: May 21, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: June 26, 2018Objection - Objection to Notice of Ruling
Date: January 17, 2019Separate Statement
Date: January 28, 2019Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: January 30, 2019Summons - Summons on First Amended Complaint
Date: January 30, 2019Reply - Reply in Support of Motion to Quash
Date: February 11, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: February 19, 2019Order - Order Court's tentative ruling re: motion to quash subpoena
Date: February 19, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash or in the alternative, to Limit th...)
Date: February 19, 2019Notice of Ruling - TENTATIVE RULING / ORDER
Date: February 19, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: March 01, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: March 12, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: March 04, 2019Declaration - Declaration of Jonny Russell
Date: March 04, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 04, 2019Separate Statement
Date: March 04, 2019Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: March 06, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: March 06, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: March 08, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: March 13, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 25, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: April 02, 2019Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: April 02, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: April 04, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING
Date: April 15, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DO LAB'S MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: April 24, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MAP'S DEMURRER TO FAC
Date: April 24, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MAP'S MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: April 24, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DO LAB'S DEMURRER TO FAC
Date: April 24, 2019Order - ORDER COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING RE: DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT MAPS
Date: May 07, 2019Order - ORDER COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING RE; DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT DO LAB'S
Date: May 07, 2019Separate Statement
Date: June 06, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS
Date: June 06, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JENNIE HENDRICKSON
Date: June 06, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFT. DO LAB, INC.'S DEMURRER RE PLFS' TAC
Date: December 02, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 02, 2019Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: December 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) - TO...)
Date: December 19, 2019Order - ORDER COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING RE: DEMURRER
Date: December 19, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GOTTLIEB'S DEMURRER
Date: December 23, 2019Notice of Motion - AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT
Date: August 13, 2018Declaration - of Casey B. Nathan in Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike
Date: August 13, 2018Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) -
Date: August 13, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: August 24, 2018PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE ACCOMPANYING OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DO LAB INC.
Date: September 05, 2018PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTINC JURY FEES
Date: September 13, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-09-13 00:00:00
Date: September 13, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: September 13, 2018NOTICE REGARDING CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: September 14, 2018Motion/Opposition/Stipulation to Transfer Complicated PI Case to IC Court and Order -
Date: September 21, 2018PLAINTIFF CARLA GATLIN'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE
Date: September 18, 2018Order - ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY ….
Date: September 21, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 27, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 01, 2018Notice of Motion - and Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas
Date: October 03, 2018Separate Statement - Re Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas
Date: October 03, 2018Request for Judicial Notice - Re Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas Duces Tecum
Date: October 03, 2018Supplemental Declaration - of Jennie Hendrickson re Motion to Quash
Date: October 04, 2018Joinder to Motion - to Quash deposition subpoenas duces tecum
Date: October 10, 2018Notice - Notice of Taking Motion To Quash Off Calendar
Date: October 19, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: October 23, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: October 23, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 06, 2018Notice - RE-NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE
Date: November 06, 2018Notice - Notice of Re-Submission of Opposition to Demurrer
Date: November 16, 2018Notice - Notice of Plaintiff's Re-Submission of Opposition to Motion to Change Venue
Date: November 09, 2018Notice - Notice Date Change on Demurrer and Motion To Strike
Date: November 13, 2018Notice - Notice of Re- Submission of their Opposition to Motion to Strike
Date: November 16, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: December 27, 2018Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: December 27, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: December 28, 2018Reply - Reply in Support of Motion to Strike
Date: January 03, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 03, 2019Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: January 10, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: January 14, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GOTTLIEB'S DEMURRER (AMENDED)
Date: December 23, 2019Order - ORDER COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING RE: DEMURRER
Date: January 09, 2020Motion for Change of Venue - MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE TO MONTEREY COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT
Date: January 10, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF CASEY B. NATHAN, ESQ IN SUPPORT
Date: January 10, 2020Answer
Date: January 10, 2020Notice of Change of Firm Name - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND MAILING ADDRESS
Date: January 10, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 17, 2020Answer
Date: January 22, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: February 05, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 21, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: March 05, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE)
Date: March 05, 2020Motion to Quash
Date: March 11, 2020Separate Statement
Date: March 11, 2020Motion to Quash
Date: March 13, 2020Separate Statement
Date: March 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: FURTHER CONTINUANCES;)
Date: March 17, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY DEPOSITION OF MARCH 20, 2020
Date: March 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCES DUE TO COVID-19)
Date: April 14, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF COURTS CONTINUANCE OF MOTION
Date: April 14, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION
Date: April 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER;)
Date: April 29, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES
Date: April 30, 2020Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Reply in Support of Motion to Strike; Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Document:Defendant's Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: August 20, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 22, 2018Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 06, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: June 14, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF CASEY B NATHAN
Date: July 12, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: July 19, 2019Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: July 19, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: August 12, 2019Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: August 13, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: August 13, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF CASEY B. NATHAN
Date: August 13, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 19, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 28, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 28, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 28, 2019Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PORTIONS OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 10, 2019Order - ORDER COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING RE: DEMURRER
Date: September 10, 2019Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 10, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) (1)B...)
Date: September 10, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: September 12, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) (1) ...)
Date: September 17, 2019Order - ORDER COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING RE: DEMURRER WITH MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: September 17, 2019Answer
Date: September 18, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: September 23, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: September 23, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE; AMENDED COMPLAINT;)
Date: September 26, 2019Answer
Date: October 15, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF CASEY B. NATHAN
Date: October 18, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: October 28, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF CASEY B. NATHAN
Date: November 20, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: November 20, 2019Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: November 20, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: RENEWAL FEE OF APPLICATION PRO...)
Date: November 27, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: November 22, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 22, 2019Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Reply in Support of Demurrer; Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Taking Motion To Quash Off Calendar; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Proof of Service of Notice by Plaintiff; Filed by:
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas; Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00RE-NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE; Filed by:
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Richard Gottlieb (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00RE-NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE; Filed by:
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Objection to Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Reply in Support of Motion to Quash; Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Order Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Declaration of Jennie Hendrickson; Filed by: Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Declaration of Casey B. Nathan; Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00TENTATIVE RULING / ORDER; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Maps, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motion; Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Opposition to DO LAB'S Motion to Strike; Filed by: Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Richard Gottlieb (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Order Court's tentative ruling re; demurrer by defendant Do Lab's; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Declaration of Casey B Nathan; Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Opposition to MAP's Demurrer to FAC; Filed by: Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Order Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer with motion to strike; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Declaration of Casey B. Nathan; Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Order Court's tentative ruling re: motion to quash subpoena; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Objection to the Declaration and Exhibits; Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Richard Gottlieb (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Opposition to MAP's Motion to Strike; Filed by: Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION
Date: June 19, 2020Reply - REPLY MEMORANDUM TO OPPOSITION
Date: June 19, 2020Notice of Outgoing Transfer
Date: October 08, 2020Receipt for Transmitted Record
Date: October 08, 2020Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT DOCUMENTS
Date: October 08, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Separate Statement Re Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas; Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Joinder to Motion to Quash deposition subpoenas duces tecum; Filed by: Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Order transferring complicated personal injury ?. Filed by:
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Richard Gottlieb (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: further continuances;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Opposition to Defendant Gottlieb's Demurrer; Filed by: Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue to Monterey County Superior Court; Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Order Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: James Farinaro (Attorney)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Order court's tentative ruling re: motion for change of venue to Monterey County; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Order Court's tentative ruling re: motion quash and motion for change of venue; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Objection to Declaration; Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Receipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: continuances due to COVID-19) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Reply Memorandum to Opposition; Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT DOCUMENTS; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mark R. Pachowicz (Attorney)
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Opposition to Defendant Gottlieb's Demurrer (Amended); Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Order Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff); Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Declaration OF CASEY B. NATHAN; Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Order Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer by defendant MAPS; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Declaration of Jonny Russell; Filed by: Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Richard Gottlieb (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Opposition to DO LAB'S Demurrer to FAC; Filed by: Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Declaration OF CASEY B. NATHAN, ESQ IN SUPPORT; Filed by: Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by Richard Gottlieb (Defendant); RGX Medical (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff); Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Notice (Date Change on Demurrer and Motion To Strike) Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Kia Motors America, Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Opposition (to MAP's Demurrer to FAC) Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff); Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Richard Gottlieb (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Notice Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff); Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Summons (on First Amended Complaint) Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff); Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff); Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff); Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Defendant Do Lab, Inc.'s Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Motion Filed by Multidisciplinary Association for Psychedelic Studies, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Notice Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff); Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Application of ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Notice (of Re-Submission of Opposition to Demurrer) Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Motion (and Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas) Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Richard Gottlieb (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff); Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (2nd)) Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff); Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: renewal fee of application pro...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Answer Filed by Multidisciplinary Association for Psychedelic Studies, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer with motion to strike) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Richard Gottlieb (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Casey B Nathan) Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Declaration (OF CASEY B. NATHAN) Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Declaration (OF CASEY B. NATHAN, ESQ IN SUPPORT) Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: motion quash and motion for change of venue) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Gottlieb's Demurrer (Amended)) Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: further continuances;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Change of Venue)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT DOCUMENTS Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue (to Monterey County Superior Court) Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Receipt for Transmitted Record Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by James Farinaro (Attorney)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Answer Filed by Richard Gottlieb (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name (and Mailing Address) Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Order (court's tentative ruling re: motion for change of venue to Monterey County) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Notice (of courts continuance of motion) Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: further continuances;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - to Portions ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Stay Deposition of March 2...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Motion) Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Gottlieb's Demurrer) Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Stay Deposition of March 2...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum to Opposition) Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: continuances due to COVID-19) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration) Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Stay Deposition of March 20, 2020) Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice (Of Continuance Of Trial And Related Dates) Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: continuances due to COVID-19)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Outgoing Transfer Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Motion/Opposition/Stipulation to Transfer Complicated PI Case to IC Court and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) as to the motion to compe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff); Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: motion to quash subpoena) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Strike) Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (to Quash deposition subpoenas duces tecum) Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Objection (to Notice of Ruling) Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Separate Statement (Re Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas) Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Opposition to Motion) Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00amended complaint Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff); Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Richard Gottlieb (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-24 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion To Quash Off Calendar) Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Opposition (to DO LAB'S Motion to Strike) Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer) Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00TENTATIVE RULING / ORDER Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Jennie Hendrickson) Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Jonny Russell) Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) as to the motion to compe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Quash) Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re; demurrer by defendant Do Lab's) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash or in the alternative, to Limit th...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re; stipulation and order to continue hearing;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff); Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Opposition (to MAP's Motion to Strike) Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Maps, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer by defendant MAPS) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Objection (to the Declaration and Exhibits) Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Opposition (to DO LAB'S Demurrer to FAC) Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Mark R. Pachowicz (Attorney)
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff); Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Answer Filed by Multidisciplinary Association for Psychedelic Studies, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - to ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Casey B. Nathan) Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (1)b...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - to...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Susan Ybarra-Telias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Casey B. Nathan) Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Richard Gottlieb (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Carla Gatlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Richard Gottlieb (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re; Amended complaint;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (1) ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Do Lab Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Motion (and Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Defendant Do Lab, Inc.'s Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to...))
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of )
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (RE-NOTICE OF DEFENDANT?S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00RE-NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (Re Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas Duces Tecum)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduling Hearing on Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Objection (to Notice of Ruling)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Motion/Opposition/Stipulation to Transfer Complicated PI Case to IC Court and Order
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice (of Re- Submission of their Opposition to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion To Quash Off Calendar)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Plaintiff's Re-Submission of Opposition to Motion to Change Venue
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Opposition (To Demurrer Of Do Lab Inc.)
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Reply (In Support of Defendants Demurrer to Portions of The Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Separate Statement (supplemental separate statement re motion to quash deposition subpoenas)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00RE-NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Opposition (to MAP's Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of Jennie Hendrickson RE Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas Duces Tecum)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of Jennie Hendrickson re Motion to Quash)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: motion to quash subpoena)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Gottlieb's Demurrer)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (to Quash deposition subpoenas duces tecum)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: renewal fee of application pro...))
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Application of ...))
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Objection (to the Declaration and Exhibits)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party In Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Reply (In Support of Defendants Motion to Strike Portions of the Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash or in the alternative, to Limit th...))
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Opposition (Declaration of Jennie Hendrickson, Esq. Opposition to Motion to Quash)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Quash)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Notice (of Re-Submission of Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer by defendant MAPS)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Jennie Hendrickson, Esq. Opposition to Motion to Quash)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Notice (Date Change on Demurrer and Motion To Strike)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00TENTATIVE RULING / ORDER
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - to Portions ...))
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) as to the motion to compe...))
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Declaration (OF JENNIE HENDRICKSON RE DO LAB DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: continuances due to COVID-19))
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Proof of Service of Notice by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Summons (on First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE TO MONTEREY COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - to ...))
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Answer (of Richard Gottlieb, an individual dba RGX Medical to First Amended Complaint for Damages)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer with motion to strike)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Opposition (to DO LAB'S Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: continuances due to COVID-19) of )
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Casey B Nathan)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Opposition to Motion)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party In Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Casey B. Nathan)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Reply (In Support of Defendant?s Motion to Change Venue to Monterey County Superior Court)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Declaration (OF CASEY B. NATHAN, ESQ IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice (of courts continuance of motion)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Motion)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...))
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Gottlieb's Demurrer (Amended))
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re; stipulation and order to continue hearing;))
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - to...))
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) as to the motion to compe...))
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Stay Deposition of March 20, 2020)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT DOCUMENTS
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER;) of )
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Stay Deposition of March 2...))
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice (Of Continuance Of Trial And Related Dates)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Casey B. Nathan pursuant to California Code of Civil procedure section 430.41)
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Separate Statement (Re Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Deft. Do Lab, Inc.'s Demurrer re Plfs' TAC)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name (and Mailing Address)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Objection (EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS RE DO LAB'S DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Opposition (to DO LAB'S Demurrer to FAC)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Casey B. Nathan)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING)
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEMURRER OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint (3rd)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to MAPS, Inc.'s Demurrer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (1)b...))
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue (to Monterey County Superior Court)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (2nd))
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Declaration (OF CASEY B. NATHAN)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Change of Venue))
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Order (court's tentative ruling re: motion for change of venue to Monterey County)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00amended complaint
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: further continuances;) of )
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Jonny Russell)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Opposition (to MAP's Demurrer to FAC)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: further continuances;))
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER;))
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re; demurrer by defendant Do Lab's)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Deft. Do Lab, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Portions of Plfs' TAC)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Jennie Hendrickson)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Opposition ( TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re; Amended complaint;))
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (1) ...))
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (OF ALL PARTIES TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Stay Deposition of March 2...) of )
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Stay Deposition of March 2...))
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00RECEIPT (Returned Receipt for Transmitted Record-Transfers - New Monterey Co. # is 20CV002753)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Receipt for Transmitted Record
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: motion quash and motion for change of venue)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum to Opposition)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Outgoing Transfer
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Casey B. Nathan pursuant to California Code of Civil procedure section 430.41)
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Opposition (To Demurrer Of Do Lab Inc.)
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Separate Statement (Re Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (Re Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas Duces Tecum)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Motion (and Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Separate Statement (supplemental separate statement re motion to quash deposition subpoenas)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (to Quash deposition subpoenas duces tecum)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 10/23/2018)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of Jennie Hendrickson RE Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas Duces Tecum)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of Jennie Hendrickson re Motion to Quash)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion To Quash Off Calendar)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Notice (Date Change on Demurrer and Motion To Strike)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Notice (of Re- Submission of their Opposition to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Notice (of Re-Submission of Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Defendant Do Lab, Inc.'s Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to...))
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Objection (to Notice of Ruling)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Application of ...))
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Opposition (Declaration of Jennie Hendrickson, Esq. Opposition to Motion to Quash)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Jennie Hendrickson, Esq. Opposition to Motion to Quash)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Summons (on First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Quash)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: motion to quash subpoena)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash or in the alternative, to Limit th...))
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Jonny Russell)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Answer (of Richard Gottlieb, an individual dba RGX Medical to First Amended Complaint for Damages)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) as to the motion to compe...))
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) as to the motion to compe...))
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduling Hearing on Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re; stipulation and order to continue hearing;))
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (RE-NOTICE OF DEFENDANT?S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING)
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Opposition (to DO LAB'S Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Opposition (to DO LAB'S Demurrer to FAC)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Opposition (to MAP's Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Opposition (to MAP's Demurrer to FAC)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re; demurrer by defendant Do Lab's)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...))
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer by defendant MAPS)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Jennie Hendrickson)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Objection (to the Declaration and Exhibits)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Opposition to Motion)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - to ...))
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Casey B Nathan)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party In Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to MAPS, Inc.'s Demurrer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Objection (EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS RE DO LAB'S DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Casey B. Nathan)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Reply (In Support of Defendants Demurrer to Portions of The Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Opposition ( TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEMURRER OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Declaration (OF JENNIE HENDRICKSON RE DO LAB DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (1) ...))
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Reply (In Support of Defendants Motion to Strike Portions of the Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (1)b...))
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer with motion to strike)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (2nd))
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re; Amended complaint;))
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Amended Complaint (3rd)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party In Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Casey B. Nathan)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Declaration (OF CASEY B. NATHAN)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: renewal fee of application pro...))
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Deft. Do Lab, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Portions of Plfs' TAC)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Deft. Do Lab, Inc.'s Demurrer re Plfs' TAC)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - to...))
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Gottlieb's Demurrer (Amended))
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Gottlieb's Demurrer)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - to Portions ...))
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Declaration (OF CASEY B. NATHAN, ESQ IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue (to Monterey County Superior Court)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name (and Mailing Address)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Order (court's tentative ruling re: motion for change of venue to Monterey County)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Reply (In Support of Defendant?s Motion to Change Venue to Monterey County Superior Court)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Change of Venue))
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: further continuances;))
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Stay Deposition of March 2...))
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: further continuances;) of 03/17/2020)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Stay Deposition of March 20, 2020)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE TO MONTEREY COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: continuances due to COVID-19) of 04/14/2020)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER;) of 04/29/2020)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Notice (of courts continuance of motion)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: motion quash and motion for change of venue)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Notice (Of Continuance Of Trial And Related Dates)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (OF ALL PARTIES TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Motion)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum to Opposition)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER;))
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: continuances due to COVID-19))
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.