Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Webspectator Corporation, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Maloney Patrick M., Mueller Carl I., against Holscher Mark Charles, Kirkland & Ellis Llp, represented by Appleby Ryan Stephen, Kahn Matthew Stewart, Rosen Kevin S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Dennis J. Landin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Landin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management85 days |
Filing DateApril 18, 2018 |
CategoryLegal Malpractice (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time551 days |
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE
Date: August 14, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT
Date: September 07, 2018Declaration - of Service
Date: October 03, 2018Motion to Seal - Motion to Seal Records
Date: November 08, 2018Declaration - Declaration of Mark Holscher
Date: November 08, 2018Declaration - Declaration of Rick Madden
Date: November 08, 2018Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: November 09, 2018Declaration - Declaration of Mark Holscher
Date: November 09, 2018Declaration - Declaration of Rick Madden
Date: November 09, 2018Declaration - Declaration Of Mark Holscher
Date: November 13, 2018Declaration - Declaration Of Rick Madden
Date: November 13, 2018Application - Application to File Documents
Date: November 15, 2018Declaration - Declaration of Carl I.S. Mueller
Date: November 15, 2018Objection - Objection Re Evidence
Date: November 15, 2018Reply - REPLY BRIEF RE MOTION
Date: November 15, 2018Reply - Reply Re Motion to Compel
Date: November 15, 2018Reply - Reply Motion to Compel
Date: November 19, 2018Application - Application to file Documents in Reply Re Motion to Compel
Date: November 19, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : Motion to Compel; Hearing on Motion to Se...)
Date: November 28, 2018Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: November 28, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
Date: December 13, 2018Order - Order Re 4 Motions to Compel
Date: December 18, 2018Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling RE Plaintiff's Discovery Motions Issued on December 13, 2018
Date: December 20, 2018Order - ORDER FILING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL
Date: December 21, 2018Joinder - JOINDER TO WEBSPECTATOR’S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL
Date: October 03, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF RYAN APPLEBY
Date: October 03, 2019Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: October 03, 2019Certificate - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: October 03, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: October 07, 2019Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS
Date: October 07, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF RYAN APPLEBY IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION
Date: October 07, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 07, 2019COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC
Date: April 18, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: April 18, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 30, 2018CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT, ETC
Date: June 25, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: June 27, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: June 27, 2018STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: July 11, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT
Date: July 12, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT
Date: July 13, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 12, 2018ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: July 19, 2018NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE
Date: August 09, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: August 13, 2018DECLARATION OF CARL I.S. MUELLER; ETC.
Date: September 28, 2018WEBSPECTATOR'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW; ETC.
Date: September 28, 2018Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: November 26, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : Motion to Compel)
Date: November 26, 2018Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 28, 2018Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: April 16, 2019Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.
Date: August 20, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF RYAN APPLEBY
Date: August 20, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF DOCUMENTS CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL
Date: August 20, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 20, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF MATTHEW KAHN
Date: August 20, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 20, 2019Certificate - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: August 20, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 20, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF DOCUMENTS CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL
Date: September 05, 2019Certificate - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: September 05, 2019Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPELL
Date: September 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION
Date: September 05, 2019Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION
Date: September 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL WEBSPECTATOR CORPORATION TO PRODU...)
Date: September 12, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 12, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF DOCUMENTS CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL
Date: September 18, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 18, 2019Separate Statement
Date: September 26, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF RYAN APPLEBY
Date: September 27, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 27, 2019Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO MAINTAIN CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS ON CERTAIN DISCOVERY MATERIALS
Date: September 27, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID ERIE
Date: September 27, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 09/30/2019
Date: September 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: September 30, 2019Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER
Date: September 30, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 03, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF RYAN APPLEBY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SEAL
Date: October 07, 2019Response - RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT
Date: October 07, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF RYAN APPLEBY
Date: October 09, 2019Certificate - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: October 09, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 09, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 09, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 RE MISAPPROPRIATION
Date: October 09, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF APPLEBY IN SUPPORT OF MIL NO. 7
Date: October 09, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXCLUSION OF ANY EVIDENCE
Date: October 10, 2019Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: October 17, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: October 17, 2019Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: October 17, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: October 21, 2019Answer
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Order-Protective
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Application (To Seal Documents)
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Application
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Application
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Declaration of Rick Madden
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Ryan Appleby in Support of Defendant Kirkland & Ellis LLP's Motion to Seal Records)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Mark Holscher)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Rick Madden)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Declaration of Mark Holscher
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Declaration (Of Mark Holscher)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Objection (Re Evidence)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Reply (Re Motion to Compel)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Declaration (Of Rick Madden)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Reply (Brief Re Motion)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Application (to File Documents)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Carl I.S. Mueller)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Reply (Motion to Compel)
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Objection (Re Evidence Submitted by Defendants)
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Motion to Compel))
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Application (to file Documents in Reply Re Motion to Compel)
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Motion to Compel; Hearing on Motion to Se...))
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling RE Plaintiff's Discovery Motions Issued on December 13, 2018
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/13/2018)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Order (Re 4 Motions to Compel)
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Order (Filing Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Order (Filing Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel (TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS LISTED ON PRIVILEGE LOGS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (OF DOCUMENTS CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (Amended Certificate Of Service.)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Certificate (OF SERVICE)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Motion to Compel (the Deposition of Goncalo Carvalho and Request for sanctions)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Ryan Appleby re Motion to Compel Deposition)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Reply (In Support Of Motion To Compel re Produce documents)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Lodging ( Of Documents Conditionally Under Seal)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objections To Declaration (produce docs))
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Certificate (Of Service)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Webspectator Corporation to Produ...))
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Certificate ( Of Service)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Of Documents Conditionally Under Seal)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Declaration (Supplemental Declaration In Support Of Its Motion (produce docs))
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodging ( of Documents Conditionally Under Seal)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Declaration (OF GREGORY M. SMITH REGARDING STATUS OF SETTING THE DEPOSITION OF GONCALO CARVALHO)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Motion re: (TO MAINTAIN CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS ON CERTAIN DISCOVERY MATERIALS)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Declaration (OF RYAN APPLEBY)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Declaration (OF DAVID ERIE)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Order (Re: Motion to Compel and Request for Sanctions on 9/12/19)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/30/2019)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Certificate (of service)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Ryan Appleby)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Joinder (TO WEBSPECTATOR?S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Immediate Compliance With...))
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Response (to Separate Statement)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE WITHHELD IN DISCOVERY BASED ON PRIVILEGE [MOTION NO. 10 OF 14])
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Documents)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Ryan Appleby in Support of Opposition)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Production of Documents)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Ryan Appleby in Support of Motion to Seal)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Documents Submitted in Support of Defendants' Motions in Limine)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Appleby In Support of MIL No. 7)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Motion to Seal (DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1, 3, AND 7)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Application (Webspectator's Appl. file MIL #1 and #2 Under Seal; declaration of Nicole A. Poltash)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine (TO EXCLUDE WEBSPECTATOR CORPORATION'S SPECULATION... [MOTION NO. 3 OF 14])
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Declaration (OF RYAN APPLEBY)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7 Re Misappropriation)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF WEBSPECTATOR CORPORATION?S NOTICE OF LODGING OF DOCUMENTS CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Regarding Exclusion of Any Evidence)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Certificate (of Service)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.