Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
10Th Street Property Llc, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Szkolnik Fred M, against Saghian David, Saghian Edwih, Saghian Parvaneh, Saghian Yahia, Six Star D.J. Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Tehrani Negar, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Patricia D. Nieto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatricia D. Nieto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2018 |
CategoryOther Contract Dispute (Not Breach/Insurance/Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Document:Notice of Trial Setting Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Document:Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by: Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Order to Show Cause; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Document:Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: David Saghian (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Parvaneh Saghian (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: 10th Street Property, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by 10TH STREET PROPERTY LLC on
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Document:Notice-Clerk's-Voiding of Filing Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Document:Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by: Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Document:Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by: Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Yahia Saghian (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Order of Discharge - Chapter 7; Filed by: Edwih Saghian (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER -
Date: February 09, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: February 09, 2018NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATFACHED ORDERS THEREON
Date: February 15, 2018NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON
Date: February 26, 2018Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: February 27, 2018ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -
Date: February 27, 2018PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION
Date: February 27, 2018ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)
Date: February 28, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 02, 2018REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -
Date: March 02, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: March 02, 2018Minute Order -
Date: March 20, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: March 21, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: March 23, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 03, 2018MEMORANDUM OF POTNTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT
Date: March 23, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 03, 2018SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -
Date: April 16, 2018Order - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 17, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 17, 2018ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER
Date: April 18, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL-CIVIL
Date: April 18, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY/RESPONSE
Date: April 20, 2018Proof of Service -
Date: April 26, 2018ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER
Date: April 26, 2018Unknown
Date: April 26, 2018ANSWER
Date: April 26, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 27, 2018DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT DAVID SAGHIAN
Date: April 26, 2018ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)
Date: April 30, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 03, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT
Date: May 17, 2018CLERK'S NOTICE OF VOIDING OF FILING
Date: May 21, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE S&C (UD)
Date: May 29, 2018NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE
Date: June 21, 2018REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -
Date: May 29, 2018NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT
Date: July 03, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: July 17, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 27, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REGARDING STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY
Date: August 02, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference)
Date: November 20, 2018Notice - Notice Status Conference and Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Bankruptcy
Date: December 14, 2018Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE BANKRUPTCY
Date: May 02, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING BANKRUPTCY AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL
Date: November 13, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 13, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 21, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/21/2020
Date: April 21, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: April 24, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: July 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 20, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: July 29, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 26, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE BANKRUPTCY)
Date: September 23, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: September 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE
Date: October 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE BANKRUPTCY)
Date: October 20, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISCHARGE - CHAPTER 7
Date: February 09, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 28, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 26, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: May 26, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: May 27, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE
Date: May 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: July 01, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT
Date: July 09, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: October 01, 2021Summons
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Order (to Show Cause)
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Voiding of Filing
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance Status Conference)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Notice (OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE BANKRUPTCY)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Notice (Status Conference and Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Bankruptcy)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/21/2020)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Status Conference))
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Notice (of Status Conference Regarding Bankruptcy and Order to Show Cause RE: Dismissal)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Status Conference)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Status Conference)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Bankruptcy))
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Notice (of Status Conference)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice (of Final Status Conference and Trial Date)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice (of Order of Discharge - Chapter 7)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Bankruptcy))
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.