Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Shum Susan, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Baker Christopher David Esq., against Air Canada Inc, Sow Alioune, represented by Littler Mendelson P.C., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael L. Stern presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael L. Stern Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2018 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time263 days |
Complaint
Date: January 09, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: January 09, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 19, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: January 19, 2018NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -
Date: January 30, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE ;ETC
Date: January 31, 2018DEFENDANT AIR CANADA, INC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: February 07, 2018Minute Order -
Date: February 06, 2018NOTICE OF FEDERAL COURT ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT
Date: March 02, 2018ORDER FOR REMAND
Date: March 02, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT
Date: March 22, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: March 22, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: March 26, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE RE: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: April 04, 2018DECLARATION OF MICHAEL CURTIS IN SUPPORT OF PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: April 04, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 10, 2018NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 19, 2018NOTICE OF LAW FIRM CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: June 22, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE RE: MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT
Date: September 06, 2018DECLARATION OF MICHAEL CURTIS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT
Date: September 06, 2018PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT
Date: September 06, 2018ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: September 28, 2018Notice of Ruling -
Date: October 03, 2018Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Approving PAGA Settlement; Filed by: Susan Shum (Plaintiff)
Date: October 03, 2018Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Document:Order-Protective Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Document:Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Susan Shum (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Document:Ntc of Removal to Federal Court Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Susan Shum (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Motion Filed by Susan Shum (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Order-Protective Filed by Joined Party
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Susan Shum (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Susan Shum (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Notice Filed by Susan Shum (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Approving PAGA Settlement Filed by Susan Shum (Plaintiff)
Date: October 03, 2018Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Susan Shum (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Order Filed by Susan Shum (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Susan Shum (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Air Canada Inc (Defendant); Alioune Sow (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Susan Shum (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Susan Shum (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Susan Shum (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Air Canada Inc (Defendant); Alioune Sow (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court Filed by Air Canada Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Answer Filed by Air Canada Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Air Canada Inc (Defendant); Alioune Sow (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Susan Shum (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Order-Protective
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Approving PAGA Settlement
Date: October 03, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.