Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lehrer-Graiwer Jonathan, Lehrer-Graiwer Sarah, Xxxxxxxx Xxxxxx, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Ecoff Lawrence C., O'Neill Mary L. Esq., against Lehrer-Graiwer Jonathan, Lehrer-Graiwer Sarah, Xxxxxxxx Xxxxxx, represented by Cole Onica Sherri, Medina Claudia Esq., Popp Elena Irene, Zambrano Vivian, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Robert B. Broadbelt presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 01, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions145 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; AND 2. DAMAGES FOR FRAUD IN THE INDUCEMENT;
Date: December 01, 2017SUMMONS -
Date: December 01, 2017NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 08, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: December 08, 2017NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: February 09, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: March 16, 2018NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 29, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: March 28, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 02, 2018OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; ETC.
Date: April 09, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 24, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT
Date: April 24, 2018ORDER RE: DEFENDANT JASMTN xxxxxxxx'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT
Date: April 24, 2018DEFENDANT JASMTN xxxxxxxx'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: May 04, 2018NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE
Date: September 04, 2018NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: September 13, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Final Status Conference;)
Date: January 11, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: January 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 15, 2021Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: January 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: December 03, 2021Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 22, 2022Witness List - WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST
Date: March 22, 2022Exhibit List
Date: March 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 25, 2022Witness List - WITNESS LIST JOINT
Date: June 09, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY
Date: June 09, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF ELENA I. POPP REGARDING THE MEET AND CONFER PROCESS
Date: June 09, 2022Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST JOINT
Date: June 09, 2022Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS JOINT
Date: June 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 10, 2022Witness List - WITNESS LIST 1ST AMENDED JOINT WITNESS LIST
Date: June 17, 2022Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST 1ST AMENDED JOINT EXHIBIT LIST
Date: June 17, 2022Statement of the Case - STATEMENT OF THE CASE STATEMENT TO BE READ TO THE JURY
Date: June 17, 2022Trial Brief
Date: June 17, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 20, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)
Date: June 22, 2022Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO UNSEAL FILE
Date: June 24, 2022Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST 2ND AMENDED JOINT EXHIBIT LIST
Date: July 19, 2022Witness List - WITNESS LIST 2ND AMENDED JOINT WITNESS LIST
Date: July 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: July 22, 2022Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENTS
Date: August 15, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: August 15, 2022Jury Instructions
Date: August 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: August 16, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 1
Date: August 16, 2022Reply - REPLY TO THE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: August 16, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: August 16, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)
Date: August 17, 2022Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF UN-REDACTED JOINT EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; JURY TRIAL)
Date: August 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL ASSIGNMENT)
Date: August 22, 2022Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: August 22, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; JURY TRIAL)
Date: August 22, 2022Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS 4TH AMENDED JOINT
Date: August 22, 2022Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: August 22, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 23, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: August 25, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS
Date: August 29, 2022Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: September 01, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court)
Date: September 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BY DEFENDANT;...)
Date: September 01, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 06, 2022Brief - DEFENDANT'S BRIEF REGARDING REDUCTION OF SERVICES AS RENT INCCREASE
Date: September 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: September 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 07, 2022Trial Brief
Date: September 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL / LONG-CAUSE)
Date: September 08, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 08, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY
Date: September 08, 2022Jury Question - JURY QUESTION FOR WITNESS JONATHAN LEHRER-GRAIWER
Date: September 08, 2022Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST 3RD AMENDED JOINT UN-REDACTED
Date: September 08, 2022Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFFS BRIEF RE: DAMAGES
Date: September 09, 2022Jury Question - JURY QUESTION FOR WITNESS SARA LEHRER-GRAIWER
Date: September 09, 2022Jury Question - JURY QUESTION TO WITNESS DEFENANT xxxxxx xxxxxxxx
Date: September 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 09, 2022Special Verdict
Date: September 15, 2022Jury Question - JURY QUESTION FOR WITNESS JONATHAN LEKERE-GRAIWER
Date: September 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 12, 2022Jury Question - JURY QUESTION FOR WITNESS BRETT TERRELL
Date: September 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 13, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 14, 2022Jury Question - JURY QUESTION FOR WITNESS xxxxxx SHOKRI
Date: September 14, 2022Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN
Date: September 15, 2022Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: September 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW - PROPOSED JUDGMENT DUE)
Date: September 26, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 26, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: September 27, 2022Judgment
Date: October 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)
Date: October 06, 2022Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: October 07, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: October 07, 2022Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING SEVERABILITY
Date: October 28, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHE...)
Date: November 01, 2022Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION
Date: November 14, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION
Date: November 14, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: November 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)
Date: November 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT OR...)
Date: December 05, 2022Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: January 04, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 04, 2023Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 05, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: January 12, 2023Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: January 13, 2023Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: January 17, 2023Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 31, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER COTNINUING FEE WAIVER HEARING FROM 02/08/2023 TO ...)
Date: February 07, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: February 07, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: February 09, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER ADVANCING FEW WAIVER HEARING FROM 02/24/2023 TO 0...)
Date: February 09, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FEE WAIVER HEARING)
Date: February 10, 2023Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: March 02, 2023Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: March 03, 2023Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "X"
Date: March 06, 2023Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 16, 2023Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: March 17, 2023Notice of Related Case
Date: July 11, 2023Motion re: - MOTION RE: ADDITIONAL RELIEF SEEKING RESCISSION
Date: October 07, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 10, 2022Notice of Motion
Date: October 21, 2022Motion for New Trial
Date: October 21, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: October 25, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RESCISSION
Date: October 25, 2022Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: October 26, 2022Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Exhibit List Joint; Filed by: JONATHAN LEHRER-GRAIWER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Jury Instructions JOINT; Filed by: xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Motion for Rescission; Filed by: xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Exhibit List 1st AMENDED JOINT EXHIBIT LIST; Filed by: JONATHAN LEHRER-GRAIWER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Witness List PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST; Filed by: JONATHAN LEHRER-GRAIWER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Exhibit List JOINT; Filed by: xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Brief Plaintiffs Brief Re: Damages; Filed by: Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference Re: Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Opposition (TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO UNSEAL FILE) Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Statement of the Case STATEMENT TO BE READ TO THE JURY; Filed by: JONATHAN LEHRER-GRAIWER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Jury Instructions Joint; Filed by: JONATHAN LEHRER-GRAIWER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Opposition TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO UNSEAL FILE; Filed by: xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Documents; Filed by: JONATHAN LEHRER-GRAIWER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine to Preclude Testimony; Filed by: JONATHAN LEHRER-GRAIWER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Witness List 2nd AMENDED JOINT WITNESS LIST; Filed by: JONATHAN LEHRER-GRAIWER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Exhibit List PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST; Filed by: JONATHAN LEHRER-GRAIWER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Witness List JOINT; Filed by: xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Exhibit List 2nd AMENDED JOINT EXHIBIT LIST; Filed by: JONATHAN LEHRER-GRAIWER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions GIVEN; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Jury Question for Witness Sara Lehrer-Graiwer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Jury Question for witness Jonathan Lekere-Graiwer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Defendant's Motion; Filed by: Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Jury Question for witness xxxxxx Shokri; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Trial Preparation Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Motion in Limine Motion in Limine to Preclude Testimony; Filed by: Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Trial Preparation Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Jury Question for Witness Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Witness List Joint; Filed by: JONATHAN LEHRER-GRAIWER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Number 1; Filed by: xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal ("X") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Motion re: (Additional Relief Seeking Rescission) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Sarah Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Continuing Feew Waiver hearing from to...) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Hearing on Motion - Othe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Advancing Few Waiver hearing from to 0...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Appellant)
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Feew Waiver hearing from to...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order cotninuing Fee Waiver Hearing from to ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objections to Declaration) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Motion for Judgment on Pleadings; Filed by: JONATHAN LEHRER-GRAIWER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Jury Instructions (GIVEN) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict or...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court) Granting Appellate Fees; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff); Sarah Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court) (Granting Appelate Fees) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Fee Waiver Hearing)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Defendant's Motion) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference Re: Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Appl...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-24 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Witness List (JOINT) Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Jury Question (for Witness Sara Lehrer-Graiwer) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Witness List (2nd AMENDED JOINT WITNESS LIST) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court) (and also additional jury fees) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Exhibit List (3rd Amended Joint Un-Redacted) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Brief (Defendant's Supplemental Brief Regarding Severability) Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court) (Granting Appellate Fees) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion for Rescission) Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Trial Preparation Order
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (RE: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Mary L. O'Neil Re: Separate Filing of Trial Documents)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice ( of Continuance of Final Status Conf and Trial)
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine (to Preclude Testimony)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference;))
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Joint)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Witness List (PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Witness List (Joint)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Notice ( Unavailability)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Exhibit List (PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Witness List (JOINT)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Exhibit List (JOINT)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Jury Instructions (JOINT)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Exhibit List (Joint)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference;))
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Exhibit List (PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Notice ( Unavailability)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/23/2020)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (RE: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice ( of Continuance of Final Status Conf and Trial)
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Witness List (PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff); Sarah Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order as to Judge Cho, Santa Monica Dept. K, OTR on at 1:30 p.m. Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Notice ( Unavailability) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: JONATHAN LEHRER-GRAIWER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Exhibit List 3rd Amended Joint Un-Redacted; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Jury Question for Witness Brett Terrell; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal "X"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-20T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application To Unseal File; Filed by: JONATHAN LEHRER-GRAIWER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Statement of the Case (STATEMENT TO BE READ TO THE JURY) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Sarah Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Exhibit List (1st AMENDED JOINT EXHIBIT LIST) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine; Filed by: JONATHAN LEHRER-GRAIWER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Witness List (1st AMENDED JOINT WITNESS LIST) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Notice Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff); Sarah Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Notice ( of Continuance of Final Status Conf and Trial) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Witness List (PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (as to Judge Cho, Santa Monica Dept. K, OTR on at 1:30 p.m.) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Jury Instructions (JOINT) Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Exhibit List (PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Exhibit List (JOINT) Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff); Sarah Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Objection Evidentiary Objections to Declaration; Filed by: Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff); As to: xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Reply Reply to Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Jury Question to Witness Defenant xxxxxx xxxxxxxx; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Brief Defendant's Supplemental Brief Regarding Severability; Filed by: xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Witness List 1st AMENDED JOINT WITNESS LIST; Filed by: JONATHAN LEHRER-GRAIWER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff); Sarah Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Brief (Plaintiffs Brief Re: Damages) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial / Long-Cause)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Continuing Feew Waiver hearing from to...) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Exhibit List (2nd AMENDED JOINT EXHIBIT LIST) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Trial Assignment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Documents) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant;...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Jury Question (for witness xxxxxx Shokri) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Jury Question (for Witness Brett Terrell) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine to Preclude Testimony) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Demurrer Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court) Granting Appelate Fees; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Joint) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Unseal File) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Exhibit List (Joint) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Jury Question (for witness Jonathan Lekere-Graiwer) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff); Sarah Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Witness List (Joint) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (for Additional Fees) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Number 1) Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Jury Question (for Witness Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Jury Question (to Witness Defenant xxxxxx xxxxxxxx) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Judgment on Pleadings) Filed by Jonathan Lehrer-Graiwer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion for Attorney Fees) Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review - Proposed Judgment Due)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Entry of Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.