Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rodriguez Mario, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Bononi Michael J. Esq., against United Parcel Service Inc., represented by Fode Stacy L. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gregory W. Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory W. Alarcon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management149 days |
Filing DateNovember 27, 2017 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time462 days |
SUMMONS -
Date: November 27, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: December 12, 2017DEFENDANT UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MARIO RODRIGUEZ'S COMPLAINT
Date: December 29, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: December 29, 2017ORDER FOR REMAND
Date: February 13, 2018Proof of Service -
Date: January 02, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 21, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 27, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: April 10, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: April 10, 2018NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT
Date: April 10, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 25, 2018Proof of Service -
Date: May 01, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 18, 2018Minute Order -
Date: May 15, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 27, 2018Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order continue trial - *DENIED*
Date: January 03, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: February 25, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: March 04, 2019Answer
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (continue trial - *DENIED*)
Date: January 03, 2019Minute order entered: 2018-05-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: February 25, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 04, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.