Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sproul Kurt, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by B & D Law Group Aplc, Farid Mahsa, Gilerman Gabrielle Rachel, Farid Mahsa Esq., Geoulla Daniel Danny Esq., (total of 5) See All against Myer Alissa Gail, Myer Barbara, represented by Huey Vanessa Annette, Mackey Robert Thomas Esq., Porter Clara L. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Reply to Opposition; Filed by: Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Opposition to ex parte applicaton; Filed by: Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Order Ruling re: Motions to Quash; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opp To Defendant's Ex Parte; Filed by: Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Omnibus Opposition; Filed by: Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Barbara Myer (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Notice OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL; Filed by: Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff); As to: Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -
Date: November 09, 2017COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: November 09, 2017DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: August 10, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: November 09, 2017Other - - Separate Statement for Motion to Quash Subpoena - Back 2 Health
Date: October 04, 2018Other - - Separate Statement to Motion to Quash Subpoena - Medical Practice Management
Date: October 04, 2018Motion to Quash -
Date: October 04, 2018Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 09, 2018Reply - Reply to Opposition
Date: December 04, 2018Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 10, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Defendant's subpoena for Medical R...)
Date: December 10, 2018Order - Order Ruling re: Motions to Quash
Date: December 12, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
Date: December 12, 2018Separate Statement
Date: March 04, 2019Separate Statement - Separate Statement SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 04, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD HANDLING ATTORNEY
Date: June 13, 2019Association of Attorney
Date: August 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: October 24, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: January 13, 2020Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: January 13, 2020Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: January 14, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 14, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 27, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES
Date: February 06, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIA...)
Date: February 06, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: February 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVE...)
Date: February 20, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: March 05, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: June 15, 2020Separate Statement
Date: June 24, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: June 24, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: June 24, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OMNIBUS OPPOSITION
Date: October 26, 2020Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS’ NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: October 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: December 16, 2020Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: December 16, 2020Motion to Quash
Date: May 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 01, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: December 08, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: February 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)
Date: February 04, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: July 18, 2022Opposition - Opposition to ex parte applicaton
Date: January 11, 2019Complaint Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Order (Ruling re: Motions to Quash) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Answer Filed by Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition) Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Opposition (to ex parte applicaton) Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opp To Defendant's Ex Parte) Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Barbara Myer (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Defendant's Ex Parte Application For a Stay of the Order Awar...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Quash Defendant's subpoena for Medical R...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OFF-CALENDAR) Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order to continue tria...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: July 18, 2022Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Strike Plaint...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation to Continue Trial) Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Omnibus Opposition) Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For An Order To Continue Tria...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice (OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL) Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion to Quash Off-Calendar) Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (- Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discove...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Quash Defendant's subpoena for Medical R...))
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition)
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opp To Defendant's Ex Parte)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Order (Ruling re: Motions to Quash)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/12/2018)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ((Defendant's Ex Parte Application For a Stay of the Order Awar...))
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Opposition (to ex parte applicaton)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Separate Statement (SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Notice (OF CHANGE OF LEAD HANDLING ATTORNEY)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For An Order To Continue Tria...))
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (For An Order To Continue Trial and All Related Dates)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (- Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discove...))
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order to continue tria...))
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an order to continue trial and all related dates;)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 02, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL
Date: June 07, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO QUASH OFF-CALENDAR
Date: June 22, 2021Motion to Quash
Date: July 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OFF-CALENDAR
Date: July 21, 2021Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 06/15/2020)
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Setting Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's F...)...COVID-19)
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion to Quash Off-Calendar)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED TRIAL DATES)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: MENTAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Omnibus Opposition)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice (OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice (DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Strike Plaint...))
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OFF-CALENDAR)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Strike Plaintiff's Notice of Motion)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.