Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Dorval Neil, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Siman Afshin, against All Cities Network, Shaw Eric, represented by Felton James Richard, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Terry Green presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management141 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 16, 2017 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time850 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: November 02, 2017Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Special...)
Date: December 13, 2018Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: April 17, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMES R. FELTON IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY
Date: April 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL)
Date: May 02, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: May 14, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: May 17, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: June 12, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: June 25, 2019NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; ETC
Date: January 22, 2018ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 24, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Special...))
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Hearing o...))
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial and relate...))
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Declaration ( of Neil Dorval in reply to oppostion to disqualify counsel)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Jeremy H. Rothstein Re: Plaintiff's Pretrial Filings)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel))
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Declaration ( of Richard Brownstein in Opposition to Motion to Disqualify)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/15/2019)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Post-Mediation Status Conference; ...))
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/29/2019)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Declaration ( of James R. Felton in Opposition to Motion to Disqualify)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of James R. Felton Re: Unilateral Pretrial Filings)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel) of 05/02/2019)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Order (re Court's written Order for Motion to Disqualify hearing held 5/2/19)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Notice ( of Trial After Final Status Conference)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Opposition ( to Motion In Limine No. 1)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Declaration ( of James R. Felton Re: Plaintiff's Absence From Mediation and His Deposition)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Notice ( of Trial After Final Status Conference)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Final Status Conference)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 01/27/2020)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: February 10, 2020Certificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 01/28/2020)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: February 07, 2020Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference))
Date: February 10, 2020Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) for Department 14))
Date: February 13, 2020Witness List
Date: February 07, 2020Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: February 07, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.