Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Los Angeles City Of Acting By Order Of, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Feuer Michael N. City Attorney, Nossaman Llp, against At&T Corp., Faroqui Kulsum B., Haider Ashfaq Khan, Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Pezeshki Mehdi, (total of 7) See All represented by Anvari Eric Esq., Davis Gleam O. Esq., Bramzon Daniel J. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Deirdre Hill presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management116 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2017 |
CategoryEminent Domain/Condemnation (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions232 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment - Uncontested |
Case Cycle Time431 days |
Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Document:Proof-Personal Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Document:Order for Publication Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Lien Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: ASHFAQ KHAN HAIDER (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Document:Appl & Ord to Publish Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Document:OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Document:Appl & Ord to Publish Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: KULSUM B. FAROQUI (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Document:Proof of Publication Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Document:Notice of Hearing Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for order for withdrawal of deposited funds; (by plaintiff); Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Judgment PARTIAL Interlocutory Judgment in Condemnation (Pacific Bell); Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Disclaimer By Mehdi Pezeshki; Filed by: LOS ANGELES, CITY OF ACTING BY ORDER OF (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Document:Lien Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Document:Lien Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Document:Partial Judgment (not entire case) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Document:Partial Judgment (not entire case) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER OF PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION
Date: November 14, 2017DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR EMINENT DOMAIN
Date: November 30, 2017Complaint
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER OF PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION; ETC
Date: October 16, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: November 16, 2017Motion for an Order
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Proof-Personal Service
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Order for Publication
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00RULING
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-29 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Partial Judgment (not entire case)
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference re mediation completion/ re the exchange;))
Date: December 07, 2018Stipulation
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF INTERLOCTUTORY JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference (J/T: 11-29-18)))
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Disclaimer (By Mehdi Pezeshki)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Partial Judgment (not entire case)
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF DEPOSITED FUNDS)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Application (For Entry Of Final Judgment and Final Order of Condemnation)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE NOTICE OF MOTION FOR POSSESSION
Date: November 22, 2017Declaration
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: November 16, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 28, 2018PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION
Date: February 05, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE RULING ON MOTION FOR POSSESSION
Date: April 04, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR ORDER OF PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION
Date: March 15, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: April 25, 2018DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: May 09, 2018ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY?S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: May 22, 2018COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN
Date: October 02, 2017DEFENDANT ASHFAQ KHAN HAIDER'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT [JURY TRIAL DEMANDED]
Date: November 09, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.