Case Last Refreshed: 12 hours ago
Mora Leticia, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, represented by Stafford Mcglinchey, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with David S. Cunningham presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid S. Cunningham Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management109 days |
Filing DateJune 12, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions451 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time451 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL
Date: March 29, 2018NOTICE OF RULING AT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: December 13, 2017MOTION TO RECONSIDER
Date: January 12, 2018NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER
Date: July 18, 2018COMPLAINT 1) WRONGFUL FORECLOSURE 2) INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATIVE RELIEF
Date: June 12, 2017AMMENDED COMPLAINT DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: January 12, 2018NOTICE OF RULING AT DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 05, 2018PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: May 04, 2018Complaint
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: September 12, 2018Order
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.