Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Dominguez Amber, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Douglas Hicks Law Apc, against Alpha Sigma Tau Sorority Inc Erroneously, Benjamin Simone Dismissed, Lynch Britney, Sanchez Brenda Dismissed, Tran Vivian Dismissed, (total of 5) See All represented by Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with David Sotelo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Sotelo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management152 days |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2014 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions250 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time578 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: April 18, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: May 24, 2017STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]; ORDER
Date: April 05, 2018DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING OFF CALENDAR
Date: June 27, 2018COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. CIVIL RIGHTS VIOLATIONS (UNRUH CIVIL RIGHTS ACT); ETC
Date: February 23, 2017DEFENDANT BRITNEY LYNCH'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: June 06, 2017Order
Date: 2014-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: September 24, 2018Motion for an Order
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: August 06, 2018Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.