Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
441 North Oakhurst Drive Condominium -, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Crane Paul N. Esq., against Beverly Hills City Of, Etco Homes Inc. Doe Defendant, represented by Nebenzahl Michael R. Esq., Zaist Carol S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2017 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time425 days |
Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: April 16, 2018ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2017ANSWER BY DOE DEFENDANT ETCO HOMES, INC. TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 20, 2017SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 31, 2017COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: February 15, 2017FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: May 31, 2017Complaint Filed by 441 North Oakhurst Drive Condominium - (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Beverly Hills, City of (Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by 441 North Oakhurst Drive Condominium - (Plaintiff)
Date: April 16, 2018First Amended Complaint Filed by 441 North Oakhurst Drive Condominium - (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Answer Filed by Beverly Hills, City of (Defendant)
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by ETCO Homes, Inc. (DOE Defendant) (Defendant)
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Summons Filed by 441 North Oakhurst Drive Condominium - (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.