Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Noor Roger, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Jong Yun Kim, against Piograph Ventures Llc, Tabello Hanny Doe 1, Tabello Omar Dismissed, Telegraph Ventures Llc, Telegraph Ventures Llc Erroneously Sued, (total of 7) See All represented by Law Offices Of Jt Fox & Assoc. Apc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with David Sotelo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Sotelo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management203 days |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2016 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial553 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions204 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time518 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: February 28, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: April 03, 2017COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. VIOLATION OF THE UNRUH CIVIL RIGHTS ACT
Date: October 11, 2016AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: November 02, 2016AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: December 07, 2016FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: March 09, 2017Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-10-18T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-10-18T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-11-02T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: February 28, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: May 03, 2017Request for Dismissal
Date: March 13, 2018Summons
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.