Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kao Evan, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Aegis Law Firm Pc, against Pride Industries, represented by Littler Mendelson P.C., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Deirdre Hill presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management109 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2016 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time284 days |
Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Document:OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Document:Amended Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 30, 2016AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2016Proof of Service -
Date: April 20, 2017COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION; ETC
Date: September 16, 2016DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: November 04, 2016Answer
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Amended Proof of Service
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.