Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Castro Elizabeth Ann, Castro John Robert, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Carpenter Zuckerman & Rowley Llp, against Cefalia Center, Cefalia Joseph Jr., Penelope Real Investments Llc, represented by Homan & Stone, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Marc D. Gross presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions519 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time561 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: January 19, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND CROSS-COMPLAINT ON ELENA SORIANO
Date: July 10, 2017ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: November 29, 2017REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND
Date: November 20, 2017COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC
Date: September 12, 2016AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: October 04, 2016AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: December 19, 2016Summons on Cross Complaint -
Date: February 17, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: February 17, 2017CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR 1. IMPLIED INDEMNITY; ETC
Date: February 17, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: June 06, 2017Summons on Cross Complaint -
Date: July 12, 2017Answer - TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: January 04, 2018Complaint
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Cross-Comp
Date: 2018-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-01-04T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: February 13, 2018Order
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00First Amended Cross Complaint
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: January 09, 2018Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: February 26, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: February 26, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.