Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nahas George, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mikhov Steven B. Esq., O'Connor & Mikhov Llp, against Mercedes-Benz Usa Llc, represented by Lehrman Kate S. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Dennis J. Landin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Landin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management128 days |
Filing DateAugust 29, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions792 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time781 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 01, 2016PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.5 ETC.
Date: January 10, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.6 ETC.
Date: January 10, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.4 ETC.
Date: January 10, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3 ETC.
Date: January 10, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2 ETC.
Date: January 10, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 ETC.
Date: January 10, 2018REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1 ETC.
Date: January 26, 2018Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Document:Association of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Declaration Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Complaint Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: October 19, 2018Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-20T00:00:00Declaration Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Answer Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Declaration Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Notice Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Notice Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Witness List Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Brief Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: October 30, 2018Reply/Response Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: October 19, 2018Opposition Document Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-12-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-12-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00RULING RE: MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: July 16, 2018REULING RE; DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS TO TAX COST
Date: September 27, 2018COMPLAINT 1. SONC-BEVERLY ACT; ETC
Date: August 29, 2016MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: October 06, 2016Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-12-20T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-12-20T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by George Nahas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Document:Motion to Tax Costs Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal))
Date: October 30, 2018Reply/Response
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.