Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Stearns Louis A. Jr., filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case against Edmunds Michael, Edmunds Richard Bonner, represented by Rogers Michael Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Samantha Jessner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamantha Jessner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2016 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions571 days |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court |
Case Cycle Time571 days |
Document:Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00Document:Request Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: February 22, 2018Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: February 05, 2018Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Document:Memo of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: February 20, 2018Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Document:Motion for Reconsideration Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2016-11-02T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Document:Notice of Bankruptcy Stay Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Bankruptcy Stay Filed by: Attorney for Debtor
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL
Date: August 24, 2016NOTICE OF RULING RE OSC (PROOF OF SERVICE)
Date: September 16, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL
Date: October 28, 2016Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: November 02, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL
Date: March 06, 2017Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: March 14, 2017Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: November 15, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL
Date: November 27, 2017Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: November 28, 2017Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: December 27, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL
Date: January 26, 2018MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: December 27, 2017COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER
Date: July 14, 2016ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER AND CLAIM TO FUNDS
Date: August 24, 2016ANSWER OF MICHAEL EDMUNDS TO COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER
Date: March 06, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2016-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Request
Date: February 22, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Memo of Costs
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.