Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Paredes Jose A., filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Law Offices Of Robert B. Mobasseri P.C., against Ally Bank, Hudson Insurance Company, La Auto Exchange, Oc Auto Exchange Inc., represented by Fallat John L. Esq., Sifers James S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gail Ruderman Feuer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGail Ruderman Feuer Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 18, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions86 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time608 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 06, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 07, 2016PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: November 21, 2016RULING RE: DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION.
Date: December 05, 2016NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: December 08, 2016AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: August 12, 2016Summons on Cross Complaint -
Date: September 19, 2016Complaint
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-08-02T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2017-12-26T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: January 16, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: January 25, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.